Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 07:18:42 (UTC).

Southern-Owners Insurance Company v. Chadwick Cove, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 Southern-Owners Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Chadwick Cove, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Polster Chappell and Mac R. McCoy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00009

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheri Polster Chappell

Referral Judge

Mac R. McCoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Southern-Owners Insurance Company

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Chadwick Cove Boat Rentals, LLC

Chadwick Cove, LLC

Gulf Island Tours, LLC

Raymond Orozco

Gulf Island Tours, LLC doing business as Chadwick Cove Boat Rentals

Chadwick Cove Boat Rental

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Carri S. Leininger

Attorney at Williams, Leininger & Cosby, PA

11300 Us Hwy 1

North Palm Beach, FL 33408-3236

Jessica Leigh Gregory

Attorney at Williams, Leininger & Cosby, PA

11300 Us Hwy 1

North Palm Beach, FL 33408-3236

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Andrew Charles Wilson

Attorney at Dickinson & Gibbons, P.A.

401 N. Cattlemen Rd., Ste. 300

Sarasota, FL 34232

Jesse R. Butler

Attorney at Dickinson & Gibbons, PA

Suite 300, 401 N Cattlemen Rd

Sarasota, FL 34232-6438

Charles W. Denny, IV

Attorney at Dickinson & Gibbons, PA

Suite 300, 401 N Cattlemen Rd

Sarasota, FL 34232-6438

Christopher Joseph DeCosta

Attorney at Holtz Mahshie DeCosta, PA

1560 Matthew Dr., Suite E

Ft Myers, FL 33907

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ANSWER to Count I & III re #19 Counterclaim, and Motion to Dismiss Count II by Southern-Owners Insurance Company.(Leininger, Carri) Modified to edit event on 3/4/2020 (MLJ). (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#25

(#25) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by Chadwick Cove Boat Rentals, LLC, Gulf Island Tours, LLC. (Wilson, Andrew) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

24 #1

Exhibit A

#24

(#24) MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Amend Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Interlineation by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

19 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

19 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

19 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#19

(#19) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Southern-Owners Insurance Company by Raymond Orozco, Chadwick Cove, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#12

(#25) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by Chadwick Cove Boat Rentals, LLC, Gulf Island Tours, LLC. (Wilson, Andrew) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS issued as to Chadwick Cove, LLC. (MLJ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#19) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Southern-Owners Insurance Company by Raymond Orozco, Chadwick Cove, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ANSWER to Count I & III re #19 Counterclaim, and Motion to Dismiss Count II by Southern-Owners Insurance Company.(Leininger, Carri) Modified to edit event on 3/4/2020 (MLJ). (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by Chadwick Cove Boat Rentals, LLC, Gulf Island Tours, LLC. (Wilson, Andrew) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Amend Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Interlineation by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2020 at 11:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than [3/30/2020]. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Chadwick Cove Boat Rentals, LLC's and Gulf Island Tours, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants Chadwick Cove Boat Rentals, LLC and Gulf Island Tours, LLC must respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1) on or before 3/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 2/18/2020. (NM) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 Complaint by Chadwick Cove Boat Rentals, LLC. (Wilson, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorneys Andrew C. Wilson, Charles W. Denny, and Jesse R. Butler on behalf of Chadwick Cove Boat Rentals, LLC (Wilson, Andrew) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Southern-Owners Insurance Company by Raymond Orozco, Chadwick Cove, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PROOF of service by Southern-Owners Insurance Company (Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PROOF of service by Southern-Owners Insurance Company (Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS issued as to Gulf Island Tours, LLC. (MLJ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS issued as to Chadwick Cove Boat Rentals, LLC. (MLJ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued as to Raymond Orozco. (MLJ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS issued as to Chadwick Cove, LLC. (MLJ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-9-FtM-38MRM. (SJB) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16322530) filed by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southern-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Leigh Gregory

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carri S. Leininger