This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2021 at 07:06:13 (UTC).

Southern California Rental Housing Association v. County of San Diego et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 Southern California Rental Housing Association filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of San Diego. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dana M. Sabraw, Daniel E. Butcher and M. James Lorenz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00912

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel E. Butcher

Presiding Judges

Dana M. Sabraw

M. James Lorenz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Southern California Rental Housing Association

Defendants

Does 1 through 20

County of San Diego

Board of Supervisors of the County of San Diego

Intervenor Defendant

Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul J. Beard, II

Attorney at FisherBroyles LLP

4470 West Sunset Boulevard, Suite 93165

Los Angeles, CA 90027

Defendant Attorney

John P. Cooley

Attorney at County Counsel

1600 Pacific Highway, Rm 355

San Diego, CA 92101

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Glenn Charles Bridgman

Attorney at Susman Godfrey

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6029

Joanne Franciscus

Attorney at Lutz & Lutz, APC

1307 Stratford Court

Del Mar, CA 92014

Krysta Kauble Pachman

Attorney at Susman Godfrey

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Marc M. Seltzer

Attorney at Susman Godfrey

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6029

Nisha N. Vyas

Attorney at Western Center on Law & Poverty

3701 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 208

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Richard A. Rothschild

Attorney at Western Center on Law and Poverty

3701 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 208

Los Angeles, CA 90010-2809

Rohit Dwarka Nath

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#23

#22

#21

#10

#3

#2

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Board of Supervisors of the County of San Diego, County of San Diego. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cooley, John) (jpp). (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Southern California Rental Housing Association. (Beard, Paul) (jpp). (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Southern California Rental Housing Association re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Beard, Paul) (jpp). (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF COUNTY OF SAN DIEGOS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELMINARY INJUNCTION by Board of Supervisors of the County of San Diego, County of San Diego re #18 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cooley, John) (jpp). (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF ERRATA AND CORRECTED BRIEF by Southern California Rental Housing Association re #24 Reply to Response to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Beard, Paul) (jpp). (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Consolidated Reply Brief filed by Southern California Rental Housing Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mary Anne Wesson, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Anya Kuzma, #3 Affidavit Declaration of April Solis, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Helen Pound, et al.)(Beard, Paul) (jpp). (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Charles Bridgman on behalf of Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action (Bridgman, Glenn)Attorney Glenn Charles Bridgman added to party Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action(pty:intvd) (jpp). (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Rohit Dwarka Nath on behalf of Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action (Nath, Rohit)Attorney Rohit Dwarka Nath added to party Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action(pty:intvd) (jpp). (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Krysta Kauble Pachman on behalf of Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action (Pachman, Krysta)Attorney Krysta Kauble Pachman added to party Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action(pty:intvd) (jpp). (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action (Seltzer, Marc)Attorney Marc M. Seltzer added to party Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action(pty:intvd) (jpp). (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY in Support re #8 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time and for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Southern California Rental Housing Association. (Beard, Paul) (tcf). (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time and for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Board of Supervisors of the County of San Diego, County of San Diego. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cooley, John) (tcf). (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time and for Temporary Restraining Order by Southern California Rental Housing Association. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Declaration, #8 Declaration, #9 Proof of Service)(Beard, Paul) (jpp). (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Southern California Rental Housing Association. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration Declaration of Larry Gale, #3 Declaration Declaration of Molly Kirkland, #4 Declaration Alan Pentico, #5 Declaration Irma Pintor, #6 Declaration April Solis, #7 Declaration Wayne Templin, #8 Proof of Service)(Beard, Paul) (jpp). (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge M. James Lorenz for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21cv0912-L-DEB.(no document attached) (mme) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Thomas J. Whelan is no longer assigned. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21cv912 BEN (DEB).(no document attached) (jcj) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas J. Whelan for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21cv0912-W-DEB.(no document attached) (mme) Modified on 5/21/2021 to correct case number (mme). (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southern California Rental Housing Association. Board of Supervisors of the County of San Diego, County of San Diego served. (Beard, Paul) (mme). (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth) (dlg). (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against County of San Diego, Board of Supervisors of the County of San Diego, Does 1 through 20 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15721990.), filed by Southern California Rental Housing Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-912-DMS-DEB. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case. (Beard, Paul) (fth) (dlg). (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE OF CALIFORNIANS FOR COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard A. Rothschild

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLENN C. BRIDGMAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Krysta Kauble Pachman