This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/15/2022 at 20:08:45 (UTC).

Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. et al v. City of Culver City et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 Southern California Healthcare System, Inc filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Culver City. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark C. Scarsi and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05052

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. a California Corporation doing business as Southern California Hospital at Culver City

Defendants

Council Member Albert Vera

Council Member Yasmine Imani McMorrin

Mayor Alex Fisch

Council Member Goran Eriksson

Vice Mayor Daniel Lee

City of Culver City

Amicus Curiae

California Hospital Association

Intervenor

Service Employees International Union United Healthcare Workers - West

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Barbara E Taylor

David A. Schwarz

James V Fazio, III

Zachary James Golda

Defendant and Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Daniel Lee Richards

Christopher M Pisano

Jeffrey V Dunn

Christopher Charles Jew

Glenn E Solomon

Intervenor Attorneys

Bruce A Harland

Catha Worthman

Genevieve Lise Casey

William T Hanley

 

Court Documents

#108

(#108) MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #60 , CCA # 21-55788. The judgment of this Court, entered April 21, 2022, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Order, #107 , All other pending motions in appeal No. 21-55788 are denied as moot. Appeal No. 21-55788 is dismissed.] (mat) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#107

(#107) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #60 filed by Southern California Healthcare System, Inc., Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #102 filed by Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.. CCA # 21-55788 and 22-55166. All other pending motions in appeal No. 21-55788 are denied as moot. Appeal No. 21-55788 is dismissed. The opening brief in appeal No. 22-55166 is due May 23, 2022; theanswering brief is due June 22, 2022; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [See document for all details.](mat) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#105

(#105) TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/25/2021. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPTION, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/4/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2022. (aa) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#104

(#104) TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 22-55166, as to Plaintiff Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Laura Lane at llane@sheppardmullin.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Asatryan, Sofya) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#103

(#103) NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 22-55166 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #102 as to plaintiff Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. (lc) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#102

(#102) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.. Appeal of Judgment,,, #101 , Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,, #97 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32774893.) (Schwarz, David) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#101

(#101) JUDGMENT by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: Pursuant to this Courts Order re: Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Motion to Stay Case; and Intervenor's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Minute Order filed January 19, 2022 #97 , it is hereby ordered, adjudged, and decreed that judgment is entered on all claims in favor of Defendants City of Culver City, Mayor Alex Fisch, Vice Mayor Daniel Lee, Council Member Yasmine-Imani McMorrin, Council Member Albert Vera, and Council Member Gran Eriksson, and against Plaintiff Southern California Healthcare System, Inc., d/b/a Southern California Hospital at Culver City. Plaintiff shall take nothing from its action against Defendants. The action is dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lc) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#100

(#100) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Response #99 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, David) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#97

(#101) JUDGMENT by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: Pursuant to this Courts Order re: Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Motion to Stay Case; and Intervenor's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Minute Order filed January 19, 2022 #97 , it is hereby ordered, adjudged, and decreed that judgment is entered on all claims in favor of Defendants City of Culver City, Mayor Alex Fisch, Vice Mayor Daniel Lee, Council Member Yasmine-Imani McMorrin, Council Member Albert Vera, and Council Member Gran Eriksson, and against Plaintiff Southern California Healthcare System, Inc., d/b/a Southern California Hospital at Culver City. Plaintiff shall take nothing from its action against Defendants. The action is dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lc) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #60 , CCA # 21-55788. The judgment of this Court, entered April 21, 2022, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Order, #107 , All other pending motions in appeal No. 21-55788 are denied as moot. Appeal No. 21-55788 is dismissed.] (mat) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #60 filed by Southern California Healthcare System, Inc., Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #102 filed by Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.. CCA # 21-55788 and 22-55166. All other pending motions in appeal No. 21-55788 are denied as moot. Appeal No. 21-55788 is dismissed. The opening brief in appeal No. 22-55166 is due May 23, 2022; theanswering brief is due June 22, 2022; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [See document for all details.](mat) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/25/2021 re Transcript #105 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (aa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/25/2021. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPTION, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/4/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2022. (aa) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 22-55166, as to Plaintiff Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Laura Lane at llane@sheppardmullin.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Asatryan, Sofya) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 22-55166 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #102 as to plaintiff Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. (lc) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.. Appeal of Judgment,,, #101 , Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,, #97 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32774893.) (Schwarz, David) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) JUDGMENT by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: Pursuant to this Courts Order re: Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Motion to Stay Case; and Intervenor's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Minute Order filed January 19, 2022 #97 , it is hereby ordered, adjudged, and decreed that judgment is entered on all claims in favor of Defendants City of Culver City, Mayor Alex Fisch, Vice Mayor Daniel Lee, Council Member Yasmine-Imani McMorrin, Council Member Albert Vera, and Council Member Gran Eriksson, and against Plaintiff Southern California Healthcare System, Inc., d/b/a Southern California Hospital at Culver City. Plaintiff shall take nothing from its action against Defendants. The action is dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lc) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Response #99 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, David) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #98 (Schwarz, David) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON ITS FORTHCOMING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFICS) #9 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on to July 12, 2021 Unopposed Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time For Hearing And Setting Briefing Schedule For Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schwarz, David) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants City of Culver City, Goran Eriksson, Alex Fisch, Daniel Lee, Yasmine Imani McMorrin and Albert Vera. (jtil) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. a California Corporation, d/b/a Southern California Hospital at Culver City, (Golda, Zachary) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. a California Corporation, d/b/a Southern California Hospital at Culver City. (Golda, Zachary) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. a California Corporation, d/b/a Southern California Hospital at Culver City. (Golda, Zachary) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31501421 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. a California Corporation, d/b/a Southern California Hospital at Culver City. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-T) (Attorney Zachary James Golda added to party Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. a California Corporation, d/b/a Southern California Hospital at Culver City(pty:pla))(Golda, Zachary) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less