This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2019 at 07:50:07 (UTC).

Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against Office of the Director of National Intelligence. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jean-Paul Boulee and J. P. Boulee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03144

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jean-Paul Boulee

J. P. Boulee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.

Defendant

Office of the Director of National Intelligence

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kimberly Stewart Hermann

Attorney at Southeastern Legal Foundation

Suite 104, 560 W. Crossville Road

Roswell, GA 30075

Defendant Attorneys

Flora Manship

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney-ATL600

600 United States Courthouse, 75 Ted Turner Dr., S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30303

Samuel Williams

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney-ATL600

600 United States Courthouse, 75 Ted Turner Dr., S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30303

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall be granted an extension of time to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint through and including November 11, 2019. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/28/19. (bnp) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

11 #2

Text of Proposed Order

11 #1

Brief

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Samuel) Modified on 8/28/2019 to edit event type (bnp). (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#10

(#10) Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Samuel Williams replacing attorney Flora Manship. (Williams, Samuel) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/20/19. (bnw) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to respond to #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/9/19. (ddm) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

7 #3

Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Attorney NDGA

7 #2

Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Attorney General

7 #1

Exhibit Proof of Service to Office of the Director of National Intelligence

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Attorney General, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Attorney NDGA)(Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manship, Flora) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#4

(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to U. S. Attorney's Office. (eop) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, U. S. Attorney General. (eop) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8783375) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/11/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall be granted an extension of time to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint through and including November 11, 2019. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/28/19. (bnp) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Samuel) Modified on 8/28/2019 to edit event type (bnp). (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Samuel Williams replacing attorney Flora Manship. (Williams, Samuel) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/20/19. (bnw) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to respond to #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/9/19. (ddm) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return of Service Executed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Attorney General, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Attorney NDGA)(Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manship, Flora) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interested Persons by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to U. S. Attorney's Office. (eop) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, U. S. Attorney General. (eop) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (eop) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8783375) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less