This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2020 at 10:08:34 (UTC).

South Nassau Orthopedic Surgery & Sports Medicine, Inc. v. United Healthcare Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 South Nassau Orthopedic Surgery Sports Medicine, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against United Healthcare Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gary R. Brown and Steven Tiscione. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04846

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary R. Brown

Referral Judge

Steven Tiscione

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

South Nassau Orthopedic Surgery & Sports Medicine, Inc.

Defendant

United Healthcare Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brendan J Kearns

Attorney at Lewin & Balgio, LLP

1100 Shames Dr

Westbury, NY 11590

Defendant Attorneys

Michael H. Bernstein

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP

Chrysler East Building, 666 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Matthew Paul Mazzola

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP

666 Third Ave, Ste 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Exhibit A-Affidavit of Service

#8

(#8) REPLY in Opposition re Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference,,,,, Defendant's Opposition to Letter-Motion filed on October 30, 2020(7) filed by United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Service) (Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#7

(#7) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference regarding Defendant's anticipated Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#6

(#6) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by South Nassau Orthopedic Surgery & Sports Medicine, Inc.. (Kearns, Brendan) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit A-State Court Stipulation

#5

(#5) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Stipulation) (Mazzola, Matthew) Modified on 10/20/2020 (Vasquez, Lea). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Paul Mazzola on behalf of United Healthcare Services, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Mazzola, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

2 #1

Additional Corrections

#2

(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2020: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 10/09/2020)

1 #5

Certificate of Service

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C-Business Record Details

1 #2

Exhibit B-Entity Information

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Healthcare Services, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York-Nassau County, case number Index No. 609260/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13493773) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Entity Information, #3 Exhibit C-Business Record Details, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service) (Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPLY in Opposition re Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference,,,,, Defendant's Opposition to Letter-Motion filed on October 30, 2020(7) filed by United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Service) (Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #7 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. A pre-motion telephone conference is scheduled for December 22, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Gary R. Brown, at which time the parties should be prepared to address defendant's anticipated motion pursuant to Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, DE 7. The parties are to call (888) 363-4734 using ACCESS CODE 4132441 five minutes prior to the designated time.The parties are on notice that in appropriate cases, the pre-motion letter and the response, along with the parties' arguments made at the pre-motion conference, may be construed at the discretion of the Court as the motion itself. Arguments not raised in the pre-motion letters or during the pre-motion conference shall be deemed waived. See In re Best Payphones, Inc., 450 F. App'x 8, 15 (2d Cir. 2011).At the conference, the Court will issue a briefing schedule if necessary. Defendant is directed to respond to DE 7 in accordance with the undersigned's individual rules by November 18, 2020. Before requesting an adjournment, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint letter with several proposed dates. The parties and other attendees to the conference are also reminded that the recording of any proceeding of the Court, including this conference, is prohibited under Local Rule 1.8. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 11/1/2020. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda) (Entered: 11/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference regarding Defendant's anticipated Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #6 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. A pre-motion telephone conference is scheduled for December 22, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Gary R. Brown, at which time the parties should be prepared to address plaintiff's anticipated motion to remand and amend the complaint, DE 6. The parties are to call (888) 363-4734 using ACCESS CODE 4132441 five minutes prior to the designated time.The parties are on notice that in appropriate cases, the pre-motion letter and the response, along with the parties' arguments made at the pre-motion conference, may be construed at the discretion of the Court as the motion itself. Arguments not raised in the pre-motion letters or during the pre-motion conference shall be deemed waived. See In re Best Payphones, Inc., 450 F. App'x 8, 15 (2d Cir. 2011).At the conference, the Court will issue a briefing schedule if necessary. Defendant is directed to respond to DE 6 in accordance with the undersigned's individual rules by November 16, 2020. Before requesting an adjournment, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint letter with several proposed dates. The parties and other attendees to the conference are also reminded that the recording of any proceeding of the Court, including this conference, is prohibited under Local Rule 1.8. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/30/2020. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by South Nassau Orthopedic Surgery & Sports Medicine, Inc.. (Kearns, Brendan) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: United Healthcare Services, Inc. answer due 10/30/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/20/2020. (Vasquez, Lea) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Stipulation) (Mazzola, Matthew) Modified on 10/20/2020 (Vasquez, Lea). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Paul Mazzola on behalf of United Healthcare Services, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Mazzola, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2020: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Healthcare Services, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York-Nassau County, case number Index No. 609260/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13493773) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Entity Information, #3 Exhibit C-Business Record Details, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service) (Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Healthcare Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Paul Mazzola

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael H. Bernstein