This case was last updated from PACER on 06/30/2020 at 08:46:58 (UTC).

SOUTH CENTRAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER v. AZAR

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 SOUTH CENTRAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against AZAR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dabney L. Friedrich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01140

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dabney L. Friedrich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTH CENTRAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

Defendant

ALEX M. AZAR, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frank W. Trapp

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR L.L.P

4270 I-55 North

Jackson, MS 39211

Defendant Attorney

Peter M. Bryce

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings, Consent MOTION to Vacate Deadline to Respond to Complaint by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALEX M. AZAR, II. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-00190. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

4 #1

Notice and Consent

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#3

(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SOUTH CENTRAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Trapp, Frank) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SOUTH CENTRAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. Case related to Case No. 19-190. (Trapp, Frank) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

1 #5

Summons Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney

1 #4

Summons U.S. Attorney General

1 #3

Summons Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - EJR Determination Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7080071) filed by SOUTH CENTRAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EJR Determination Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #5 Summons Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney)(Trapp, Frank) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's #7 Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings and Vacate Deadline to Respond to Complaint. The defendant's deadline for responding to the complaint is vacated. This case is stayed pending consolidation or further action on the #6 Notice of Related Case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 24, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings, Consent MOTION to Vacate Deadline to Respond to Complaint by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALEX M. AZAR, II. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-00190. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SOUTH CENTRAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Trapp, Frank) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SOUTH CENTRAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. Case related to Case No. 19-190. (Trapp, Frank) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7080071) filed by SOUTH CENTRAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EJR Determination Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #5 Summons Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney)(Trapp, Frank) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less