This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2021 at 09:38:05 (UTC).

South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The et al v. McMaster et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The filed a Civil Right - Reapportionment lawsuit against McMaster. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J Michelle Childs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-03302

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Reapportionment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J Michelle Childs

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The

Taiwan Scott

Defendants

Henry D McMaster

Harvey Peeler

Luke A Rankin

James H Lucas

Chris Murphy

Wallace H Jordan

John Wells

JoAnne Day

Clifford J Elder

Linda McCall

Scott Moseley

Howard Knapp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher James Bryant

Attorney at Boroughs Bryant LLC

1122 Lady Street, Suite 208

Columbia, SC 29201

David Allen Chaney, Jr

Attorney at ACLU of South Carolina

1220 Laurens Road, Suite B

Greenville, SC 28607

John Cusick

Attorney at NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund Inc

40 Rector Street, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

Leah C Aden

Attorney at NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund Inc

40 Rector Street, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

Patricia Yan

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Inc

915 15Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Raymond Audain

Attorney at NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund Inc

40 Rector Street, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

Samantha Osaki

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Inc

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Sarah Michelle Gryll

Attorney at Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

70 West Madison Street, Suite 4200

Chicago, IL 60602

Somil B Trivedi

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Inc

915 15Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Stuart Naifeh

Attorney at NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund Inc

40 Rector Street, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Ernest Mills

Attorney at Spero Law LLC

557 East Bay Street, #22251

Charleston, SC 29413

Michael Gregory Shedd

Attorney at Office of the Governor

1100 Gervais Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Thomas Ashley Limehouse, Jr

Attorney at Office of the Governor

1100 Gervais Street

Columbia, SC 29201

William Grayson Lambert

Attorney at Office of the Governor

1100 Gervais Street

Columbia, SC 29201

La'Jessica Stringfellow

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Robert E Tyson, Jr

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Vordman Carlisle Traywick

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

John M Gore

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Stephen J Kenny

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Andrew Addison Mathias

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet (Gville)

Po Box 10648

Greenville, SC 29603

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#72

(#72) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Wells Nicholson on behalf of Clifford J Elder, Howard Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells (Nicholson, Thomas) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#71

(#71) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Wells Nicholson on behalf of JoAnne Day (Nicholson, Thomas) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#70

(#70) ORDER granting [ECF No. 17] Plaintiffs' Motion Requesting a Three-Judge Panel pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2248(a). Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 12/9/2021.(aabd, ) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#68

(#68) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by JoAnne Day, Clifford J Elder, Howard Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells.(Burchstead, Michael) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#67

(#67) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by JoAnne Day, Clifford J Elder, Howard Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells.(Burchstead, Michael) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#66

(#66) NOTICE of Appearance by Jane W Trinkley on behalf of JoAnne Day, Clifford J Elder, Howard Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells (Trinkley, Jane) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#65

(#65) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Crum on behalf of JoAnne Day, Clifford J Elder, Howard Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells (Crum, Mary) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#64

(#64) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Reid Burchstead on behalf of JoAnne Day, Clifford J Elder, Howard Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells (Burchstead, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#51

(#63) ORDER AND OPINION granting in part #51 Motion to Stay by House Defendants'; denying #57 Motion to Dismiss by Senate Defendants'; and Staying the case until January 18, 2022. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/12/2021.(asni, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

#1

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Wells Nicholson on behalf of Clifford J Elder, Howard Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells (Nicholson, Thomas) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Wells Nicholson on behalf of JoAnne Day (Nicholson, Thomas) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) ORDER granting [ECF No. 17] Plaintiffs' Motion Requesting a Three-Judge Panel pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2248(a). Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 12/9/2021.(aabd, ) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docket(#69) TEXT ORDER: The court previously stayed the proceedings in this case until January 18, 2021, to give the South Carolina Legislature time to draw up districting plans ahead of upcoming election deadlines. (ECF No. 63.) At this time, Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 59) and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 61) remains pending before the court. In order to facilitate the timely and judicious resolution of these issues once the stay is lifted, the court now orders the parties to file any responses in opposition to the pending motions by Friday, December 17, 2021. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 12/6/2021. (asni, ) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by JoAnne Day, Clifford J Elder, Howard Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells.(Burchstead, Michael) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by JoAnne Day, Clifford J Elder, Howard Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells.(Burchstead, Michael) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) NOTICE of Appearance by Jane W Trinkley on behalf of JoAnne Day, Clifford J Elder, Howard Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells (Trinkley, Jane) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Crum on behalf of JoAnne Day, Clifford J Elder, Howard Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells (Crum, Mary) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Reid Burchstead on behalf of JoAnne Day, Clifford J Elder, Howard Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells (Burchstead, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) ORDER AND OPINION granting in part #51 Motion to Stay by House Defendants'; denying #57 Motion to Dismiss by Senate Defendants'; and Staying the case until January 18, 2022. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/12/2021.(asni, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to John Wells. (asni, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Howard Knapp. (asni, ) (Main Document 10 replaced on 10/22/2021) (asni, ). Modified to replace document to correct scrivener's error on 10/22/2021 (asni, ). (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Wallace H Jordan. (asni, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Chris Murphy. (asni, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to James H Lucas. (asni, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Luke A Rankin. (asni, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Harvey Peeler. (asni, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Henry D McMaster. (asni, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The.(asni, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/13/2021) (asni, ). (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10118586.), filed by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The. Service due by 1/10/2022(asni, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/22/2021) (asni, ). Modified to replace document to correct scrivener's error on 10/22/2021 (asni, ). (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael G. Shedd

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen J. Kenny

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Ernest Mills