This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/11/2022 at 06:48:13 (UTC).

South Carolina School Boards Insurance Trust v. Great American Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 South Carolina School Boards Insurance Trust filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Great American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sherri A Lydon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01493

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sherri A Lydon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

South Carolina School Boards Insurance Trust

Defendants

Great American Insurance Company

Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Thomas King

Attorney at King Love Hupfer and Nance LLC

Po Box 1764

Florence, SC 29503

Defendant Attorneys

Cory Bradley Patterson

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough - Char

301 South College Street, 23Rd Floor

Charlotte, NC 28202

John Robert Murphy

Attorney at Murphy and Grantland

Po Box 6648

Columbia, SC 29260

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

State Court Documents Richland County Court of Common Pleas; 2022-CP-40-1283

1 #2

Certificate of Service

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast.(ahil) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (ahil) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#5

(#5) CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Great American Insurance Company. (Patterson, Cory) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#6

(#6) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/31/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 6/14/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/25/2022, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 8/18/2022, Defendants' ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/19/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/7/2022, Discovery due by 11/7/2022, Motion in Limine due by 1/5/2023, Motions due by 11/21/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/17/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 4/5/2023, Mediation Due by 12/5/2022, Signed by the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on May 10, 2022. (ahil) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/31/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 6/14/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/25/2022, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 8/18/2022, Defendants' ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/19/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/7/2022, Discovery due by 11/7/2022, Motion in Limine due by 1/5/2023, Motions due by 11/21/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/17/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 4/5/2023, Mediation Due by 12/5/2022, Signed by the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on May 10, 2022. (ahil) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Great American Insurance Company. (Patterson, Cory) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (ahil) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast.(ahil) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CP-40-1283. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10484145), filed by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Richland County Court of Common Pleas; 2022-CP-40-1283, #2 Certificate of Service)(ahil) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Selective Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases where Great American Insurance Company of New York is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Robert Murphy