This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:50:11 (UTC).

Souter v. Republic Finance L L C et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Souter filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Republic Finance L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark L Hornsby and Elizabeth E Foote. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00015

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark L Hornsby

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth E Foote

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chasiti Souter

Defendants

Republic Finance, LLC

Weems, Schimpf, Haines, Shemwell & Moore, APLC

Weems Schimpf Haines Shemwell & Moore A P L C

Republic Finance L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Managan Lee Johnson

Attorney at Johnson Law Office (BR)

2528 Myrtle Ave

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit Garnishment Order

1 #3

Exhibit Proof of Payments

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chasiti Souter. Weems Schimpf Haines Shemwell & Moore A P L C waiver sent on 1/13/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (aty,Johnson, Managan) Modified on 2/11/2020 to change waiver sent and answer due dates (Williams, L). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

4 #7

Exhibit G

4 #3

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit Partial Remittance

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chasiti Souter. Republic Finance L L C waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (aty,Johnson, Managan) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit A

4 #5

Exhibit E

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Republic Finance L L C, Weems Schimpf Haines Shemwell & Moore A P L C (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4146853) filed by Chasiti Souter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Garnishment Order, #2 Exhibit Signed Settlement, #3 Exhibit Proof of Payments, #4 Exhibit Proof of Garnishments, #5 Exhibit Partial Remittance, #6 Exhibit Letter to Discontinue Garnishment, #7 Exhibit Partial Remittance)(Attorney Managan Lee Johnson added to party Chasiti Souter(pty:pla))(aty,Johnson, Managan) Modified to edit text on 1/7/2020 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

4 #6

Exhibit F

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Republic Finance L L C, Weems Schimpf Haines Shemwell & Moore A P L C with Jury Demand filed by Chasiti Souter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(aty,Johnson, Managan) Modified to remove duplicate docket text and to edit docket text on 1/13/2020 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

4 #2

Exhibit B

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Chasiti Souter. (aty,Johnson, Managan) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Republic Finance L L C, Weems Schimpf Haines Shemwell & Moore A P L C. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

1 #7

Exhibit Partial Remittance

1 #6

Exhibit Letter to Discontinue Garnishment

4 #4

Exhibit D

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chasiti Souter. Weems Schimpf Haines Shemwell & Moore A P L C waiver sent on 1/13/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (aty,Johnson, Managan) Modified on 2/11/2020 to change waiver sent and answer due dates (Williams, L). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chasiti Souter. Republic Finance L L C waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (aty,Johnson, Managan) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/13/2020. (crt,Rider, M) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Republic Finance L L C, Weems Schimpf Haines Shemwell & Moore A P L C with Jury Demand filed by Chasiti Souter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(aty,Johnson, Managan) Modified to remove duplicate docket text and to edit docket text on 1/13/2020 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Republic Finance L L C, Weems Schimpf Haines Shemwell & Moore A P L C. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Chasiti Souter. (aty,Johnson, Managan) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Republic Finance L L C, Weems Schimpf Haines Shemwell & Moore A P L C (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4146853) filed by Chasiti Souter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Garnishment Order, #2 Exhibit Signed Settlement, #3 Exhibit Proof of Payments, #4 Exhibit Proof of Garnishments, #5 Exhibit Partial Remittance, #6 Exhibit Letter to Discontinue Garnishment, #7 Exhibit Partial Remittance)(Attorney Managan Lee Johnson added to party Chasiti Souter(pty:pla))(aty,Johnson, Managan) Modified to edit text on 1/7/2020 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.