This case was last updated from PACER on 02/18/2020 at 08:00:01 (UTC).

SOTO v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 SOTO filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judge overseeing this case is Claire C. Cecchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-21981

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOSE SOTO

Fairton, NJ 08320

Respondent

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JULIE A. MCGRAIN

Attorney at FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

800 - 840 Cooper Street, Suite 350

Camden, NJ 08102

Respondent Attorneys

JOHN GAY

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE US ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street, Suite 700

Newark, NJ 07102

NORMAN JOEL GROSS

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE US ATTORNEY

401 Market Street, 4Th Floor

Camden, NJ 08101

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by NORMAN JOEL GROSS on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (GROSS, NORMAN) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#4

(#4) Proposed Pretrial Order for Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (GROSS, NORMAN) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit A (Indictment)

#7

(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jose Soto. (sms) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

1 #1

Court Order

#5

(#5) ORDER REGARDING REVISED BRIEFING SCHEDULE that Petitioners shall file a joint supplemental brief in support of their 2255 motions by 1/17/2020; the Government shall file its joint responsive brief by 2/19/2020; Petitioners shall file their joint reply brief by 3/20/2020, etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/16/2020. (sm) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE A. MCGRAIN on behalf of JOSE SOTO (MCGRAIN, JULIE) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

6 #2

Index B (Jury Verdict Sheet)

#6

(#6) BRIEF Petitioners' Joint Memorandum in Support of Motion to Vacate Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Indictment), #2 Index B (Jury Verdict Sheet))(MCGRAIN, JULIE) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 98-547, filed by JOSE SOTO. (Attachments: #1 Court Order)(ld, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jose Soto. (sms) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) BRIEF Petitioners' Joint Memorandum in Support of Motion to Vacate Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Indictment), #2 Index B (Jury Verdict Sheet))(MCGRAIN, JULIE) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REGARDING REVISED BRIEFING SCHEDULE that Petitioners shall file a joint supplemental brief in support of their 2255 motions by 1/17/2020; the Government shall file its joint responsive brief by 2/19/2020; Petitioners shall file their joint reply brief by 3/20/2020, etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/16/2020. (sm) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Pretrial Order for Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (GROSS, NORMAN) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by NORMAN JOEL GROSS on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (GROSS, NORMAN) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE A. MCGRAIN on behalf of JOSE SOTO (MCGRAIN, JULIE) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 98-547, filed by JOSE SOTO. (Attachments: #1 Court Order)(ld, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.