This case was last updated from PACER on 07/22/2019 at 07:49:54 (UTC).

SOTO v. GARZA et al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 SOTO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GARZA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02055

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUAN SOTO

Defendants

GARY GARZA

C.R. ENGLAND, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katherine G. Karres

Attorney at HENSLEY LEGAL GROUP, PC

117 East Washington Street, Suite 200

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Chelsea Steele Hyslop

Attorney at FROST BROWN TODD LLC (Indianapolis)

201 North Illinois Street, Suite 1900

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0961

Eric A. Riegner

Attorney at FROST BROWN TODD LLC (Indianapolis)

201 North Illinois Street, Suite 1900, P.O. Box 44961

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0961

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by JUAN SOTO.(Karres, Katherine) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine G. Karres on behalf of Plaintiff JUAN SOTO. (Karres, Katherine) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to C.R. ENGLAND, INC., GARY GARZA. (HET) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Riegner on behalf of Defendants C.R. ENGLAND, INC., GARY GARZA. (Riegner, Eric) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#11

(#11) Defendants' ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint), filed by C.R. ENGLAND, INC., GARY GARZA.(Hyslop, Chelsea) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER ON JURISDICTION - The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file an amended complaint by July 2, 2019, that alleges the citizenship of the parties. Because "an amended complaint supersedes any prior complaint," Riley v. Elkhart Community Schools, 829 F.3d 886, 890 (7th Cir. 2016), Defendants should answer the second amended complaint rather than the initial complaint. (See Order). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 6/18/2019.(JDH) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER - Plaintiff has filed a Complaint in which she alleges that this Court has diversity jurisdiction over this matter. For the Court to have diversity jurisdiction over the parties, the amount in controversy must exceed "$75,000, exclusive of interest and costs." Therefore, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint by June 21, 2019, which addresses the issue outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Court's diversity jurisdiction (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 5/31/2019.(DWH) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JUAN SOTO. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5444808) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Karres, Katherine) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by JUAN SOTO.(Karres, Katherine) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Steele Hyslop on behalf of Defendants C.R. ENGLAND, INC., GARY GARZA. (Hyslop, Chelsea) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Defendants' ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint), filed by C.R. ENGLAND, INC., GARY GARZA.(Hyslop, Chelsea) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by JUAN SOTO.(Karres, Katherine) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER ON JURISDICTION - The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file an amended complaint by July 2, 2019, that alleges the citizenship of the parties. Because "an amended complaint supersedes any prior complaint," Riley v. Elkhart Community Schools, 829 F.3d 886, 890 (7th Cir. 2016), Defendants should answer the second amended complaint rather than the initial complaint. (See Order). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 6/18/2019.(JDH) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Steele Hyslop on behalf of Defendants C.R. ENGLAND, INC., GARY GARZA. (Hyslop, Chelsea) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Riegner on behalf of Defendants C.R. ENGLAND, INC., GARY GARZA. (Riegner, Eric) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by JUAN SOTO.(Karres, Katherine) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER - Plaintiff has filed a Complaint in which she alleges that this Court has diversity jurisdiction over this matter. For the Court to have diversity jurisdiction over the parties, the amount in controversy must exceed "$75,000, exclusive of interest and costs." Therefore, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint by June 21, 2019, which addresses the issue outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Court's diversity jurisdiction (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 5/31/2019.(DWH) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to C.R. ENGLAND, INC., GARY GARZA. (HET) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine G. Karres on behalf of Plaintiff JUAN SOTO. (Karres, Katherine) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JUAN SOTO. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5444808) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Karres, Katherine) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.