This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2022 at 08:18:47 (UTC).

Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa v. BMW of North America, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Karen L. Stevenson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09816

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa

Defendants

BMW of North America, LLC

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James P Martinez

Attorney at California Consumer Attorneys PC

10866 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Michael H Rosenstein

Attorney at California Consumer Attorneys PC

10866 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Sepehr Daghighian

Attorney at California Consumer Attorneys PC

10866 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorneys

Samantha Koopersmith

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Daniel R Villegas

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#16

(#16) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Case Number: 21STCV42377. (jp) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#15

(#15) (IN CHAMBERS) Order Remanding Action to State Court by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court finds that Defendant has not plausibly alleged that the amount in controversy meets the jurisdictional requirement. Accordingly, the Court REMANDS this action to state court for all further proceedings. (Made JS-6 Case Terminated.) (See Civil Minutes for further specifics). (jp) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/28/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2022 at 9:00 am. (sw) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#13

(#13) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#12

(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James P Martinez counsel for Plaintiff Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa. Adding James P. Martinez as counsel of record for Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa. (Martinez, James) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#11

(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sepehr Daghighian counsel for Plaintiff Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa. Adding Sepehr Daghighian as counsel of record for Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa. (Daghighian, Sepehr) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael H Rosenstein counsel for Plaintiff Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa. Adding Michael H. Rosenstein as counsel of record for Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa. (Rosenstein, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Rosenstein, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#4

(#4) Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Declaration Samantha M. Koopersmith

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Case Number: 21STCV42377. (jp) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) (IN CHAMBERS) Order Remanding Action to State Court by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court finds that Defendant has not plausibly alleged that the amount in controversy meets the jurisdictional requirement. Accordingly, the Court REMANDS this action to state court for all further proceedings. (Made JS-6 Case Terminated.) (See Civil Minutes for further specifics). (jp) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/28/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2022 at 9:00 am. (sw) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James P Martinez counsel for Plaintiff Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa. Adding James P. Martinez as counsel of record for Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa. (Martinez, James) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sepehr Daghighian counsel for Plaintiff Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa. Adding Sepehr Daghighian as counsel of record for Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa. (Daghighian, Sepehr) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael H Rosenstein counsel for Plaintiff Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa. Adding Michael H. Rosenstein as counsel of record for Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa. (Rosenstein, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Rosenstein, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Jury Demand #3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 12-21-21. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Filed in State Court on 12/20/2021 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants BMW of North America, LLC, Does 1 through 10, inclusive. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Santa Cruz Sosa. Filed in State Court on 11/17/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV42377 Receipt No: ACACDC-32511662 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Samantha M. Koopersmith, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Attorney Samantha Koopersmith added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samantha Koopersmith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kate S Lehrman