This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2020 at 08:20:53 (UTC).

Sosa v. Autozone Stores LLC

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Sosa filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Autozone Stores LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00018

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Sosa

Kill Devil Hills, NC 27948

Defendant

Autozone Stores LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

George J. Oliver

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

Post Office Box 27525

Raleigh, NC 27611

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice filed by David Sosa. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE to Motion regarding #8 MOTION to Dismiss and supporting brief filed by David Sosa. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#10

(#10) Financial Disclosure Statement by Autozone Stores LLC identifying Corporate Parent AutoZone, Inc. for Autozone Stores LLC. (Oliver, George) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#9

(#9) Rule 12 Letter Issued to David Sosa as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss and supporting brief. Responses due by 5/20/2020. Copy sent via US Mail to David Sosa PO Box 1695, Kill Devil Hills, NC 27948. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Wood

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss and supporting brief filed by Autozone Stores LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Wood) (Oliver, George) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#7

(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by George J. Oliver on behalf of Autozone Stores LLC. (Oliver, George) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#5

(#5) USPS Return Receipt addressed to Autozone Stores. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Autozone Stores LLC. Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#3

(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement filed by David Sosa. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Self-Representation filed by David Sosa. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Autozone Stores LLC (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number GRN002436), filed by David Sosa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice filed by David Sosa. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE to Motion regarding #8 MOTION to Dismiss and supporting brief filed by David Sosa. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Financial Disclosure Statement by Autozone Stores LLC identifying Corporate Parent AutoZone, Inc. for Autozone Stores LLC. (Oliver, George) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Autozone Stores LLC. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Rule 12 Letter Issued to David Sosa as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss and supporting brief. Responses due by 5/20/2020. Copy sent via US Mail to David Sosa PO Box 1695, Kill Devil Hills, NC 27948. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss and supporting brief filed by Autozone Stores LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Wood) (Oliver, George) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by George J. Oliver on behalf of Autozone Stores LLC. (Oliver, George) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) USPS Return Receipt addressed to Autozone Stores. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Autozone Stores LLC. Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement filed by David Sosa. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Self-Representation filed by David Sosa. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Autozone Stores LLC (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number GRN002436), filed by David Sosa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less