This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/19/2021 at 09:02:47 (UTC).

Sorrells v. Advanced Call Center Technologies, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 Sorrells filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Advanced Call Center Technologies, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark Pittman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00883

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tawanna Sorrells

Defendant

Advanced Call Center Technologies, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allen Ryan Vaught

Attorney at Vaught Firm, LLC

1910 Pacific Ave, Suite 9150

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by Tawanna Sorrells. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's agreed motion to extend deadline to file responsive pleading to original complaint. ECF No. #8 . Having considered the motion, the Court finds it should be and hereby is GRANTED in part. Therefore, it is ORDERED Defendant's deadline to respond is extended up to and including August 26, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/5/2021) (pef) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Agreed MOTION to Extend Time Deadline for Defendant to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by Tawanna Sorrells (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Advanced Call Center Technologies, LLC ; served on 7/23/2021. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 07/24/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Advanced Call Center Technologies, LLC. (pef) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#5

(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (pef) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Tawanna Sorrells. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

3 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Consent to Join of Tawanna Sorrells

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Tawanna Sorrells on 4/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent to Join of Tawanna Sorrells) (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tawanna Sorrells. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Advanced Call Center Technologies, LLC filed by Tawanna Sorrells. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12072906) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per #10 PLAINTIFF'S STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (pef) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by Tawanna Sorrells. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's agreed motion to extend deadline to file responsive pleading to original complaint. ECF No. #8 . Having considered the motion, the Court finds it should be and hereby is GRANTED in part. Therefore, it is ORDERED Defendant's deadline to respond is extended up to and including August 26, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/5/2021) (pef) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Agreed MOTION to Extend Time Deadline for Defendant to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by Tawanna Sorrells (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Advanced Call Center Technologies, LLC ; served on 7/23/2021. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 07/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Advanced Call Center Technologies, LLC. (pef) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (pef) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Tawanna Sorrells. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Tawanna Sorrells on 4/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent to Join of Tawanna Sorrells) (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tawanna Sorrells. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Advanced Call Center Technologies, LLC filed by Tawanna Sorrells. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12072906) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Call Center dba ACT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allen R Vaught