This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:28:04 (UTC).

SOROKA v. WALMART, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 SOROKA filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against WALMART, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-21079

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEEGAN SOROKA

Defendants

ABC CORP.

WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC.

JANE DOES 1 THROUGH 10

WALMART SUPERCENTER #2651

WALMART, INC.

WAL-MART STORES EAST I, LP

WAL-MART STORES, INC.

JOHN DOES 1 THROUGH 10

XYZ, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK S. GURALNICK

923 Haddonfield Road, Suite 300

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

Defendant Attorney

NADA MAALOUF PETERS

Attorney at d'ARCAMBAL OUSLEY & CUYLER BURK, LLP

Four Century Drive

Parsippany, NJ 07054

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART STORES EAST I, LP, WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART SUPERCENTER #2651, WALMART, INC.. (PETERS, NADA) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART SUPERCENTER #2651, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST I, LP from Superior Court of New Jersey, Somerset County, case number SOM-L-001491-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10158413), filed by WALMART SUPERCENTER #2651, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST I, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #2 Exhibit B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(PETERS, NADA) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #4

Certificate of Service

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Amended Complaint by WAL-MART STORES EAST I, LP, WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART SUPERCENTER #2651, WALMART, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PETERS, NADA) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 2:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/05/2019. (jem) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 5/12/2020 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Any motion to amend the pleadings or join new parties due by 4/24/2020. Fact Discovery due by 8/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/23/2020. (jem) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketText Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/23/2020. (mm) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 5/12/2020 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Any motion to amend the pleadings or join new parties due by 4/24/2020. Fact Discovery due by 8/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/23/2020. (jem) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Amended Complaint by WAL-MART STORES EAST I, LP, WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART SUPERCENTER #2651, WALMART, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PETERS, NADA) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 2:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/05/2019. (jem) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART STORES EAST I, LP, WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART SUPERCENTER #2651, WALMART, INC.. (PETERS, NADA) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART SUPERCENTER #2651, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST I, LP from Superior Court of New Jersey, Somerset County, case number SOM-L-001491-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10158413), filed by WALMART SUPERCENTER #2651, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST I, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #2 Exhibit B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(PETERS, NADA) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.