This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2021 at 08:48:48 (UTC).

Sorin, v. The Folger Coffee Company ***Do Not File in this Case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-2984***

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 Sorin filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against The Folger Coffee Company Do Not File in this Case - All filings should be made in 4 21-md-2984. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00222

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marcia Sorin

Defendant

The Folger Coffee Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Laurence D Paskowitz

Attorney at Paskowitz Law Firm PC

60 East 42Nd Street, 46Th Floor, 212-68-0696

New York, NY 10165

Patricia Nicole Syverson

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC

600 West Broadway, Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101

Roy L. Jacobs

Attorney at Roy Jacobs & Associates

420 Lexington Avenue, Suite 2440

New York, NY 10170

Beth A. Keller

Attorney at FARUQI & FARUQI, LLP

369 Lexington Avenue, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10017-6531

Emily Cornelia Komlossy

Attorney at Komlossy Law P.A.

4700 Sheridan Street, Suite J

Hollywood, FL 33021

Elaine A. Ryan

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC

2325 E Camelback Rd., Suite 300

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorneys

Sean H Suber

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Cristina Isabel Calvar

Attorney at Winston , Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Megan L Whipp

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

333 South Grand Avenue, 38Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1543

Ronald Y Rothstein

Attorney at Winston & Strawn/Chicago

35 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

42 #1

*Restricted*

#42

(#42) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 9:20-cv-80897. (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#41

(#41) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (TO-Dated 04/01/2021) transferring case to the Western District of Missouri re: MDL 2984 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Beth Phillips. (Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair). (mc) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 04/02/2021)

40 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#40

(#40) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant by Megan L. Whipp for / by The Folger Coffee Company. Responses due by 4/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Calvar, Cristina) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 04/01/2021)

39 #2

Text of Proposed Order

39 #1

Exhibit A (Redline)

#39

(#39) MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #37 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal re Second Amended Complaint by The Folger Coffee Company. Responses due by 4/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redline), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Calvar, Cristina) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#37

(#37) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Folger Coffee Company filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Marcia Sorin.(Komlossy, Emily) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING,granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Laurence Paskowitz ; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Beth A. Keller. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/11/2020. See attached document for full details. Text Modified on 6/11/2020 (mee). [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#7

(#8) ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING,granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Laurence Paskowitz ; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Beth A. Keller. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/11/2020. See attached document for full details. Text Modified on 6/11/2020 (mee). [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#6

(#8) ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING,granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Laurence Paskowitz ; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Beth A. Keller. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/11/2020. See attached document for full details. Text Modified on 6/11/2020 (mee). [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (jas) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#4

(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Laurence D. Paskowitz, Roy L. Jacobs, Beth A. Keller, mailing date June 5, 2020, (pt) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to The Folger Coffee Company. (mee) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/05/2020)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#10) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer the Initial Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Marcia Sorin. Responses due by 7/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Komlossy, Emily) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/24/2020)

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 9:20-cv-80897. (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per DE #41 Transfer Order. Closing Case. (mc) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (TO-Dated 04/01/2021) transferring case to the Western District of Missouri re: MDL 2984 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Beth Phillips. (Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair). (mc) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant by Megan L. Whipp for / by The Folger Coffee Company. Responses due by 4/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Calvar, Cristina) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #37 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal re Second Amended Complaint by The Folger Coffee Company. Responses due by 4/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redline), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Calvar, Cristina) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Courtesy Copy of TRANSFER ORDER (TO-Dated 4/01/2021) transferring case to the Western District of Missouri re: MDL 2984 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Beth Phillips. (Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair). (Awaiting certified copy from the transferee court). (mc) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Folger Coffee Company filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Marcia Sorin.(Komlossy, Emily) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER granting #24 Motion to Dismiss complaint without prejudice. Second Amended Complaint due by 3/18/2021. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (lk) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER denying as moot #17 First Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/31/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #21 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal and Memorandum in Support, with Request for Telephonic Hearing filed by The Folger Coffee Company. (Calvar, Cristina) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer the Initial Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Marcia Sorin. Responses due by 7/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Komlossy, Emily) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Marcia Sorin. All Defendants. (Komlossy, Emily) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING,granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Laurence Paskowitz ; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Beth A. Keller. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/11/2020. See attached document for full details. Text Modified on 6/11/2020 (mee). [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Beth A. Keller, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13008028 by Marcia Sorin. Responses due by 6/24/2020 (Komlossy, Emily) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Laurence Paskowitz, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13008008 by Marcia Sorin. Responses due by 6/24/2020 (Komlossy, Emily) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (jas) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Laurence D. Paskowitz, Roy L. Jacobs, Beth A. Keller, mailing date June 5, 2020, (pt) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to The Folger Coffee Company. (mee) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12983936, filed by Marcia Sorin, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Komlossy, Emily) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2021.] (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Folger Coffee Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laurence D Paskowitz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beth A Keller

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roy L Jacobs