This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2019 at 12:59:32 (UTC).

Sorey v. Cenikor Foundation

Case Summary

On 05/01/2019 Sorey filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Cenikor Foundation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00267

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gregory Sorey

Marlon Woods

Ashley Rogers

Adam Ross Johnson

Esteban Collins

David Dupuis

Samuel Wayne Cutrer

Chris Mendow

John London

Stuart Baye

Jeremiah J. Harrison

Ginamarie Samudio-Penick

Austen Brown

Suzanne Babin

Charles Evan

Beau Lirette

Ronnie Williams

Mattie Daniels

Dustin Carroll

Defendant

Cenikor Foundation

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Garret Scott DeReus

Attorney at Bizer & DeReus, LLC

3319 St. Claude Ave.

New Orleans, LA 70117

Andrew David Bizer

Attorney at Bizer & DeReus

3319 St. Claude Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70117

Zachary Flowerree

Attorney at Werman Salas P.C.

3121 22Nd Street

Lubbock, TX 79410

Douglas M Werman

77 W. Washington, Suite 1402

Chicago, IL 60602

Emily Anne Westermeier

Attorney at Bizer & DeReus, LLC

3319 St. Claude Ave

New Orleans, LA 70117

Defendant Attorneys

David Gregory

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

600 Travis, Jp Morgan, Chase Tower

Houston, TX 77002

Joel Paul Babineaux

Attorney at Babineaux, Poche, Anthony & Slavich, LLC

P O Box 52169

Lafayette, LA 70505

Andrew W. Reed

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2800 Jp Morgan Chase, 600 Travis

Houston, TX 77002

Karen Bordelon

Attorney at Babineaux Poche Anthony & Slavich

Post Office Box 52169

Lafayette, LA 70505

Bradley Clay Knapp

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

601 Poydras St., Suite 2660

New Orleans, LA 70130

Chris Dove

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2800 Jpmorgan Chase Tower, 600 Travis

Houston, TX 77002

Frank Sommerville

Attorney at Weycer, Kaplan, Pulaski & Zuber, P.C.

3030 Matlock Rd., Suite 201

Arlington, TX 76015

 

Court Documents

45 #2

Proposed Pleading;

45 #1

Proposed Order

#45

(#45) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Notice Regarding Potential Mootness of Motions in Light of Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to First to File Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(DeReus, Garret) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

44 #1

Exhibit A

#44

(#44) NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westermeier, Emily) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

43 #2

Exhibit A

43 #1

Memorandum in Support

#43

(#43) Joint MOTION to Change Venue to First-to-File Court by Gregory Sorey and by Cenikor Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Knapp, Bradley) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#42

(#42) Joint Initial STATUS REPORT by Defendant and by All Plaintiffs. (DeReus, Garret) Modified on 6/28/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 06/27/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeReus, Garret) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Cenikor Foundation. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) NOTICE of of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeReus, Garret) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

1 #3

Attachment Executed Consent Form

1 #2

Attachment Summons

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cenikor Foundation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1935621.), filed by Gregory Sorey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons, #3 Attachment Executed Consent Form)(DeReus, Garret) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Notice Regarding Potential Mootness of Motions in Light of Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to First to File Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(DeReus, Garret) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westermeier, Emily) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) Joint MOTION to Change Venue to First-to-File Court by Gregory Sorey and by Cenikor Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Knapp, Bradley) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) Joint Initial STATUS REPORT by Defendant and by All Plaintiffs. (DeReus, Garret) Modified on 6/28/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ORDER granting #39 Unopposed MOTION Designate Lead Attorney. Zachary C. Flowerree is hereby designated as lead counsel for plaintiff Gregory Sorey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) MOTION to Consolidate Case with 3:19-cv-00268; and 3:19-cv-00294 and Appointment of Lead Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Flowerree, #3 Exhibit 2 - Werman, #4 Exhibit 3 - DeReus, #5 Attachment Proposed Order)(DeReus, Garret) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #39 Unopposed MOTION Designate Lead Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Unopposed MOTION Designate Lead Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeReus, Garret) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER: The Civil Action Nos. 19-cv-267, 19-cv-268 and 19-cv-294 are set for a Status Conference on 7/1/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/19/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westermeier, Emily) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Zachary C. Flowerree to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1936867). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Douglas M. Werman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1936835). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Zachary C. Flowerree to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1936867) by Gregory Sorey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration and Certificate of Good Standing)(DeReus, Garret) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Douglas M. Werman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1936835) by Gregory Sorey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration and Certificate of Good Standing)(DeReus, Garret) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeReus, Garret) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Cenikor Foundation. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeReus, Garret) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Cenikor Foundation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1935621.), filed by Gregory Sorey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons, #3 Attachment Executed Consent Form)(DeReus, Garret) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.