This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:43:54 (UTC).

Soptich v. Stryker Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Soptich filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Stryker Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian A Tsuchida and Richard A. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00744

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Brian A Tsuchida

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric P Soptich

Defendants

Stryker Corporation

Howmedics Osteonics Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rodney K Nelson

Attorney at ABEYTA NELSON P.C.

1102 W Yamima Ave

Yakima, WA 98902

Defendant Attorneys

Heather A. Hedeen

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY & BACON LLP (WA)

701 5Th Ave Ste 6800

Seattle, WA 98104

Ryan S Killian

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY & BACON LLP (TX)

600 Travis St, Ste 3400

Houston, TX 77002

Hunter K Ahern

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY & BACON LLP (WA)

701 5Th Ave Ste 6800

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) STIPULATION Dismissal of Defendant Stryker Corporation by parties (Nelson, Rodney) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

19 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Orders on Motion to Dismiss and Strike

#19

(#19) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint Motion to Dismiss and Strike #11 Amended Complaint by Howmedics Osteonics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Orders on Motion to Dismiss and Strike)(Ahern, Hunter) Modified event and docket text on 7/8/2019 (MW). (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION to Extend Time for Stryker to Answer 1st Amended Complaint by parties (Ahern, Hunter) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

11 #4

Summons

11 #3

Exhibit 3

11 #2

Exhibit 2

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

(#18) ORDER granting Parties #14 Stipulated Extension and striking noting date of Defendant's #8 Motion to Dismiss: Stryker Corporation shall answer Plaintiff's #11 First Amended Complaint or otherwise move the Court for relief by 7/5/2019. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (MW) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before Magistrate Judge Tsuchida if this form is not returned by 5/28/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AE) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#4

(#4) LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#3

(#3) AMENDMENT to Attachment (2) Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Stryker Corporation (Hedeen, Heather) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Stryker Corporation (Hedeen, Heather) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Complaint

#1

(#6) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and the parties' written stipulation (Dkt. #20 ), Defendant Stryker Corporation is voluntarily dismissed from this lawsuit, without prejudice and without an award of costs or fees to either party. (KMP) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STIPULATION Dismissal of Defendant Stryker Corporation by parties (Nelson, Rodney) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Noting Date Set re #19 MOTION to Dismiss: Noting Date 8/2/2019 (MW) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint Motion to Dismiss and Strike #11 Amended Complaint by Howmedics Osteonics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Orders on Motion to Dismiss and Strike)(Ahern, Hunter) Modified event and docket text on 7/8/2019 (MW). (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting Parties #14 Stipulated Extension and striking noting date of Defendant's #8 Motion to Dismiss: Stryker Corporation shall answer Plaintiff's #11 First Amended Complaint or otherwise move the Court for relief by 7/5/2019. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (MW) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) REPLY, filed by Defendant Stryker Corporation, TO RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss (Ahern, Hunter) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ryan S Killian for Defendant Stryker Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ryan S. Killian FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Stryker Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5816049 (Ahern, Hunter) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STIPULATION to Extend Time for Stryker to Answer 1st Amended Complaint by parties (Ahern, Hunter) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Eric P Soptich, to #8 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Rodney) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint; and defenses by Stryker Corporation.(Hedeen, Heather) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Stryker Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Furgason Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order 12b2, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order 12b6) Noting Date 6/28/2019, (Hedeen, Heather) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Hon. Brian A Tsuchida pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (AE) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before Magistrate Judge Tsuchida if this form is not returned by 5/28/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AE) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (GT) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDMENT to Attachment (2) Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Stryker Corporation (Hedeen, Heather) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Stryker Corporation (Hedeen, Heather) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-11049-0 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5771452) Attorney Heather A. Hedeen added to party Stryker Corporation(pty:dft), filed by Stryker Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hedeen, Heather) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2019: #4 Complaint) (KB). Modified on 5/20/2019 (KB). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.