This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/17/2023 at 13:31:34 (UTC).

Sonya Valenzuela v. Michael Kors (USA), Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2022 Sonya Valenzuela filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Michael Kors USA , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alexander F. MacKinnon and Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-05902

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

Presiding Judge

Sherilyn Peace Garnett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonya Valenzuela

Defendants

Michael Kors (USA), Inc.

DOES 1 through 25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David W. Reid

Attorney at Pacific Trial Attorneys APC

4100 Newport Place Suite 800

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Scott J Ferrell

Attorney at Pacific Trial Attorneys APC

4100 Newport Place Drive Suite 800

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Victoria C. Knowles

Attorney at Pacific Trial Attorneys APC

4100 Newport Place, Suite 800

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca J. Wahlquist

Attorney at Kelley Drye and Warren LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3800

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Geoffrey W. Castello

Attorney at Kelley Drye and Warren LLP

One Jefferson Road, 2Nd Floor

Parsippany, NJ 07054

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. Dismissal is with Prejudice. (Ferrell, Scott) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. (Ferrell, Scott) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#19

(#19) ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Geoffrey W. Castello APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Kors (USA), Inc., designating Rebecca J. Wahlquist as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

18 #3

Proposed Order

18 #2

Certificate of Good Standing (NY)

18 #1

Certificate of Good Standing (NJ)

#18

(#18) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Geoffrey W. Castello to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34412739) filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (NJ), #2 Certificate of Good Standing (NY), #3 Proposed Order) (Wahlquist, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#17

(#17) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS #13 TO JANUARY 25, 2023 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Having reviewed the parties Joint Stipulation seeking to continue the hearing date for Michael Kors Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 13], and for good cause shown, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. The hearing on Michael Kors Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 13] is continued from Wednesday, December 7, 2022 at 01:30 PM to Wednesday, January 25, 2023, at 01:30 PM; 2. Michael Kors Reply Briefing in support of its Motion shall be filed no later than January 4, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rolm) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

13 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on August 19, 2022. (Wahlquist, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#3

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on August 19, 2022. (Wahlquist, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#2

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on August 19, 2022. (Wahlquist, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. Dismissal is with Prejudice. (Ferrell, Scott) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • Docket(#21) SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: On January 3, 2023, Plaintiff filed Notice of Settlement (Dkt. No. 20). The Court sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for February 22, 2023 at 1:30 p.m. If the parties file a dismissal by February 15, 2023, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance by counsel will be required. All pending dates are vacated.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. (Ferrell, Scott) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Geoffrey W. Castello APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Kors (USA), Inc., designating Rebecca J. Wahlquist as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Geoffrey W. Castello to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34412739) filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (NJ), #2 Certificate of Good Standing (NY), #3 Proposed Order) (Wahlquist, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS #13 TO JANUARY 25, 2023 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Having reviewed the parties Joint Stipulation seeking to continue the hearing date for Michael Kors Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 13], and for good cause shown, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. The hearing on Michael Kors Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 13] is continued from Wednesday, December 7, 2022 at 01:30 PM to Wednesday, January 25, 2023, at 01:30 PM; 2. Michael Kors Reply Briefing in support of its Motion shall be filed no later than January 4, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rolm) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint #13 filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Becca J. Wahlquist in support of Joint Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Wahlquist, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint #13 filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ferrell, Scott) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint #13 filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wahlquist, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/7/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Wahlquist, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Michael Kors (USA), Inc. answer now due 9/22/2022, filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc..(Wahlquist, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela in Los Angeles Superior Court on 7/22/2022, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on August 19, 2022. (Wahlquist, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc. identifying Capri Holdings Limited as Corporate Parent. (Wahlquist, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc.. (Wahlquist, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV23635 Receipt No: ACACDC-33842860 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Rebecca J. Wahlquist added to party Michael Kors (USA), Inc.(pty:dft))(Wahlquist, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less