This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2021 at 12:28:24 (UTC).

Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC et al v. Priddis

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 Sony Music Publishing US LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Priddis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is John J Tuchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01053

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J Tuchi

 

Party Details

Appellants

SONY MUSIC PUBLISHING (US) LLC, formerly known as SONY/ATV MUSIC PUBLISHING LLC

COMBINE MUSIC CORP.

SONY

EMI APRIL MUSIC INC.

EMI U CATALOG INC.

EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS INC.

COLGEMS-EMI MUSIC INC.

STONE DIAMOND MUSIC CORP.

EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC.

EMI ROBBINS CATALOG INC.

EMI MILLER CATALOG INC.

SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC.

EMI UNART CATALOG INC.

EMI FEIST CATALOG INC.

JOBETE MUSIC CO INC.

Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC

Colgems-EMI Music Incorporated

Combine Music Corporation

EMI April Music Incorporated

Appellee

RICHARD L PRIDDIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

James B Ball

Attorney at Ball Santin & McLeran PLC

2999 N 44Th St., Ste. 500

Phoenix, AZ 85018

Appellee Attorneys

Mark Joseph Giunta

Attorney at Law Office of Mark J Giunta

531 E Thomas Rd., Ste. 200

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Dai Trang Liz Nguyen

Attorney at Law Office of Mark J Giunta

531 E Thomas Rd., Ste. 200

Phoenix, AZ 85012

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#9

#8

7 #1

Appendix Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY BRIEF by Colgems-EMI Music Incorporated, Combine Music Corporation, EMI April Music Incorporated, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, EMI Feist Catalog Incorporated, EMI Miller Catalog Incorporated, EMI Robbins Catalog Incorporated, EMI U Catalog Incorporated, EMI Unart Catalog Incorporated, Jobette Music Company Incorporated, Screen Gems-EMI Music Incorporated, Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corporation. (Ball, James) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED granting Appellee Richard L. Priddis's Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Response Brief up and through July 20, 2021. (Doc. #9 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Appellant Sony Music Publishing LLC's Objections to Filing of Appellee's Response Brief (Doc. #10 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this Order to file its Reply. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/22/21. (SMH) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE to Motion re: #10 MOTION For the court to not consider Appellee's late brief re: #8 Brief - Bankruptcy Response , #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Brief - Bankruptcy Response //Response to Objections to Filing of Appellee's Response Brief filed by Richard L Priddis. (Nguyen, Dai Trang) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #11 Notice (Other) filed by Richard L Priddis, #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Brief - Bankruptcy Response filed by Richard L Priddis, #12 Notice (Other) filed by Richard L Priddis, #8 Brief - Bankruptcy Response filed by Richard L Priddis. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Caption as to Purported Debtor was capitalized. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SMH) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) *NOTICE by Richard L Priddis re: #8 Brief - Bankruptcy Response //Notice of Filing Certification Required by Local Bankruptcy Rule 8010-1(c). (Nguyen, Dai Trang) *Document not in compliance with Local Rule. Attorney notified on 7/21/2021. (SMH) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) *NOTICE by Richard L Priddis re: #8 Brief - Bankruptcy Response //Notice of Filing Certification Required by Local Bankruptcy Rule 8010-1(b). (Nguyen, Dai Trang) *Document not in compliance with Local Rule. Attorney notified on 7/21/2021. (SMH) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION For the court to not consider Appellee's late brief re: #8 Brief - Bankruptcy Response by Colgems-EMI Music Incorporated, Combine Music Corporation, EMI April Music Incorporated, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, EMI Feist Catalog Incorporated, EMI Miller Catalog Incorporated, EMI Robbins Catalog Incorporated, EMI U Catalog Incorporated, EMI Unart Catalog Incorporated, Jobette Music Company Incorporated, Screen Gems-EMI Music Incorporated, Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corporation. (Ball, James) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) * MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Brief - Bankruptcy Response by Richard L Priddis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Dai Trang) *Document not in compliance with Local Rule. Attorney notified on 7/21/2021. (SMH) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) *RESPONSE BRIEF by Richard L Priddis. (Nguyen, Dai Trang) *Document not in compliance with Local Rule. Attorney notified on 7/21/2021. (SMH) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) OPENING BRIEF by Colgems-EMI Music Incorporated, Combine Music Corporation, EMI April Music Incorporated, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, EMI Feist Catalog Incorporated, EMI Miller Catalog Incorporated, EMI Robbins Catalog Incorporated, EMI U Catalog Incorporated, EMI Unart Catalog Incorporated, Jobette Music Company Incorporated, Screen Gems-EMI Music Incorporated, Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief)(Ball, James) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colgems-EMI Music Incorporated, Combine Music Corporation, EMI April Music Incorporated, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, EMI Feist Catalog Incorporated, EMI Miller Catalog Incorporated, EMI Robbins Catalog Incorporated, EMI U Catalog Incorporated, EMI Unart Catalog Incorporated, Jobette Music Company Incorporated, Screen Gems-EMI Music Incorporated, Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corporation. (Ball, James) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER - The appellant shall serve and file an opening brief with the Clerk, United States District Court, within fourteen (14) days of the date this order is filed. FURTHER, TAKE NOTICE that pursuant to LRCiv 16.2(b)(1)(A)(i) this action is designated an expedited track case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to comply with provisions of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Appeal Procedure and this Order may result in the court taking action for failure to perfect the appeal, including possible dismissal pursuant to LRBankr 8020-1. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/22/2021. (LAD) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Colgems-EMI Music Incorporated, Combine Music Corporation, EMI April Music Incorporated, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, EMI Feist Catalog Incorporated, EMI Miller Catalog Incorporated, EMI Robbins Catalog Incorporated, EMI U Catalog Incorporated, EMI Unart Catalog Incorporated, Jobette Music Company Incorporated, Screen Gems-EMI Music Incorporated, Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corporation. (REK) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (REK) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF READINESS. The Record on Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court is complete. The Bankruptcy Court shall retain the record. The filing of this Certificate constitutes the date of entry of the appeal on the docket in the District Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, ) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court by Clerk US Bankruptcy Court (Phx). (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, ) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI Robbins Catalog Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI Miller Catalog Inc. is a litigant