This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/13/2021 at 08:13:46 (UTC).

Sony Music Entertainment et al v. Gymshark Limited et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 Sony Music Entertainment filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Gymshark Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Consuelo B. Marshall and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05731

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Consuelo B. Marshall

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sony Music Entertainment

Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC

Zomba Recording LLC

Arista Music

La Face Records LLC

Records Label, LLC

The Century Media Family, Inc.

Defendants

Gymshark Limited

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rollin A Ransom

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 West Fifth Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1010

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiffs Records Label, LLC, Zomba Recording LLC, The Century Media Family, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Arista Music, Sony Music Entertainment, La Face Records LLC. upon Gymshark Limited waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/21/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Staci Riordan. (Ransom, Rollin) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-05731 CBM(AGRx). (rn) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Gymshark Limited. (jtil) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Arista Music, La Face Records LLC, Records Label, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, The Century Media Family, Inc., Zomba Recording LLC. (Ransom, Rollin) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by plaintiffs Arista Music, La Face Records LLC, Records Label, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, The Century Media Family, Inc.. (Ransom, Rollin) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiffs Arista Music, La Face Records LLC, Records Label, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, The Century Media Family, Inc. identifying Sony Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Ransom, Rollin) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Arista Music, La Face Records LLC, Records Label, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, The Century Media Family, Inc.. (Ransom, Rollin) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-31635827 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Records Label, LLC, Zomba Recording LLC, The Century Media Family, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Arista Music, Sony Music Entertainment, La Face Records LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Rollin A Ransom added to party Arista Music(pty:pla), Attorney Rollin A Ransom added to party La Face Records LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Rollin A Ransom added to party Records Label, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Rollin A Ransom added to party Sony Music Entertainment(pty:pla), Attorney Rollin A Ransom added to party Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Rollin A Ransom added to party The Century Media Family, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Rollin A Ransom added to party Zomba Recording LLC(pty:pla))(Ransom, Rollin) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZOMBA RECORDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sony Music Entertainment Italy S.p.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rollin Ransom