This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:00:03 (UTC).

SONS OF CONFEDERATE VETERANS, GENERAL HENRY L. BENNING CAMP NO. 517 v. CITY OF COLUMBUS et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 SONS OF CONFEDERATE VETERANS, GENERAL HENRY L BENNING CAMP NO 517 filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CITY OF COLUMBUS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAY D LAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00203

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY D LAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SONS OF CONFEDERATE VETERANS, GENERAL HENRY L. BENNING CAMP NO. 517

SONS OF CONFEDERATE VETERANS GENERAL HENRY L BENNING CAMP NO 517

Defendants

JERRY "POPS" BARNES

JUDY W. THOMAS

GLENN DAVIS

CITY OF COLUMBUS

BRUCE HUFF

R. WALKER GARRETT

BERRY H HENDERSON

PAM HODGE

CHARMAINE CRABB

R. GARY ALLEN

R WALKER GARRETT

JERRY BARNES

JUDY W THOMAS

R GARY ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIMOTHY KYLE KING

177 N Main St

Jonesboro, GA 30236

Defendant Attorneys

THOMAS F GRISTINA

Po Box 1199

Columbus, GA 31902-1199

JAMES C CLARK, JR

P.O. Box 1199

Columbus, GA 31902-1199

AUSTIN S GIBSON

Po Box 1199

Columbus, GA 31902

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) JUDGMENT remanding the case to the Superior Court of Muscogee County, Georgia (tlf). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

6 #2

Proposed Order proposed order on motion to remand

6 #1

Memorandum in Support brief in support of motion to remand

#6

(#6) UNOPPOSED MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support by SONS OF CONFEDERATE VETERANS GENERAL HENRY L BENNING CAMP NO 517 filed by TIMOTHY KYLE KING. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support brief in support of motion to remand, #2 Proposed Order proposed order on motion to remand)(KING, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit A -- Resolution No. 349-19

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint/Petition by R GARY ALLEN, JERRY BARNES, CITY OF COLUMBUS, CHARMAINE CRABB, GLENN DAVIS, R WALKER GARRETT, BERRY H HENDERSON, PAM HODGE, BRUCE HUFF, JUDY W THOMAS. Related document: #4 Amended Complaint/Petition filed by SONS OF CONFEDERATE VETERANS GENERAL HENRY L BENNING CAMP NO 517. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Resolution No. 349-19)(GRISTINA, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) AMENDED complaint as to #1 Notice of Removal, against All Defendants by SONS OF CONFEDERATE VETERANS GENERAL HENRY L BENNING CAMP NO 517 (KING, TIMOTHY) Modified on 12/17/2019 (tlf). (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#3

(#3) Georgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by T KYLE KING (nop) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#2

(#2) RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 1/21/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 12/10/2019 (tlf). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - State Court Filings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3333011, $400 filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - State Court Filings)(GRISTINA, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JUDGMENT remanding the case to the Superior Court of Muscogee County, Georgia (tlf). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #6 Motion to Remand. Plaintiff filed a motion to remand this action because Plaintiff has dismissed its federal question claims against Defendants and the only remaining claims are state law claims. Defendants do not oppose the remand. The motion is granted, and this action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of Muscogee County. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 1/7/2020 (CCL) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) UNOPPOSED MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support by SONS OF CONFEDERATE VETERANS GENERAL HENRY L BENNING CAMP NO 517 filed by TIMOTHY KYLE KING. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support brief in support of motion to remand, #2 Proposed Order proposed order on motion to remand)(KING, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint/Petition by R GARY ALLEN, JERRY BARNES, CITY OF COLUMBUS, CHARMAINE CRABB, GLENN DAVIS, R WALKER GARRETT, BERRY H HENDERSON, PAM HODGE, BRUCE HUFF, JUDY W THOMAS. Related document: #4 Amended Complaint/Petition filed by SONS OF CONFEDERATE VETERANS GENERAL HENRY L BENNING CAMP NO 517. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Resolution No. 349-19)(GRISTINA, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED complaint as to #1 Notice of Removal, against All Defendants by SONS OF CONFEDERATE VETERANS GENERAL HENRY L BENNING CAMP NO 517 (KING, TIMOTHY) Modified on 12/17/2019 (tlf). (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Georgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by T KYLE KING (nop) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 1/21/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 12/10/2019 (tlf). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL T. KYLE KING - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing may be scheduled (tlf). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by R. WALKER GARRETT, BERRY H. HENDERSON, R. GARY ALLEN, BRUCE HUFF, CITY OF COLUMBUS, CHARMAINE CRABB, GLENN DAVIS, JERRY BARNES, PAM HODGE; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. No need to re-file (tlf). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3333011, $400 filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - State Court Filings)(GRISTINA, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.