This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2023 at 07:53:06 (UTC).

Sonrai Memory Ltd. v. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 Sonrai Memory Ltd filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01498

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonrai Memory Ltd.

Defendants

Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP

Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen B. Brauerman

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

600 N. King Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Ronald P. Golden, III

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

600 N. King Street, Ste 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Brett E. Cooper

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin M. Capuzzi

Attorney at Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff

1313 North Market Street, Ste 1201

Wilmington, DE 19801

Manish K. Mehta

Noelle Briana Torrice

Attorney at Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff

1313 North Market Street, Ste 1201

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint to January 20, 2023 - filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP. (Capuzzi, Kevin) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#22

(#22) STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES. (kmd) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

21 #4

Exhibit D

21 #3

Exhibit C

21 #2

Exhibit B

21 #1

Exhibit A

21 #21

Main Document

#20

(#20) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kathleen Watson Moss - filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP. (Capuzzi, Kevin) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP c/o CT Corporation System on November 21, 2022, filed by Sonrai Memory Ltd.. (Golden, Ronald) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting D.I. #4 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 11/18/2022. (smg) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

4 #4

Main Document

3 #1

Summons Issued

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint to January 20, 2023, filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP. Reset Answer Deadlines: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company answer due 1/20/2023; Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP answer due 1/20/2023. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/3/2023. (kmd) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint to January 20, 2023 - filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP. (Capuzzi, Kevin) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES. (kmd) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The main document as D.I. #21 , First Amended Complaint (Public Version), has been replaced per counsel's request. (kmd) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REDACTED VERSION of #16 Amended Complaint, by Sonrai Memory Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Golden, Ronald) (Main Document 21 replaced on 12/28/2022) (kmd). (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kathleen Watson Moss, filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/21/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kathleen Watson Moss - filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP. (Capuzzi, Kevin) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #15 MOTION to File Under Seal / Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal. Plaintiff shall file a public version of the First Amended Complaint, with the confidential information redacted, within seven days. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/19/2022. (nmf) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Sonrai Memory Ltd.. (Golden, Ronald) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STATEMENT / Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Ltd.'s Certification of Diversity Jurisdiction by Sonrai Memory Ltd.. (Golden, Ronald) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REDACTED VERSION of #1 Complaint, by Sonrai Memory Ltd.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP c/o CT Corporation System on November 21, 2022, filed by Sonrai Memory Ltd.. (Golden, Ronald) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketRemark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (smg) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting D.I. #4 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 11/18/2022. (smg) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketRemark: Exit electronic copies to Duty Judge GBW. (smg) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Seal Document: #1 Complaint, Unopposed NUNC PRO TUC Motion to File Under Seal - filed by Sonrai Memory Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Golden, Ronald) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company on 11/16/2022; Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP on 11/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued)(apk) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) [SEALED]COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4006687.) - filed by Sonrai Memory Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) Modified on 11/17/2022 (smg). (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less