Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/24/2021 at 10:36:19 (UTC).

Sonrai Memory Limited v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

 

On February 23, 2021, Sonrai Memory Limited (“Plaintiff” or “Sonrai”), represented by Reza Mirzaie of Russ August & Kabat, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (collectively, “Defendants” or “Samsung”), seeking permanent injunctive relief and damages among other reliefs for allegedly infringing Sonrai’s intellectual property relating to improvements in computer chip architecture having multiple processors on a single die and charge pump circuits. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding

 

The Plaintiff alleged that the Defendants have infringed one or more claims under United States Patent Numbers 6,874,014 entitled “Chip Multiprocessor with Multiple Operating Systems.” (“the ’014 Patent”) and 6,724,241 entitled “Variable Charge Pump Circuit with Dynamic Load.” (“the ’241 Patent”) owned by Sonrai.

 

The Plaintiff alleged that “Samsung makes, uses, offers for sale, sells, and/or imports certain products and services, including without limitation products with Qualcomm Snapdragon SoCs containing at least one Hexagon DSP, including without limitation the Samsung Galaxy S20 (“Accused Products”), that directly infringe, literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents, one or more claims of the ’014 Patent.” 

 

Plaintiff further alleged that “Samsung has had knowledge of the ’014 Patent and the infringing nature of the Accused Products. Despite this knowledge of the ’014 Patent, Samsung continues to actively encourage and instruct its customers and end users (for example, through user manuals and online instruction materials on its website) to use the Accused Products in ways that directly infringe the ’014 Patent. Samsung does so knowing and intending that its customers and end users will commit these infringing acts. Samsung also continues to make, use, offer for sale, sell, and/or import the Accused Products, despite its knowledge of the ’014 Patent, thereby specifically intending for and inducing its customers to infringe the ’014 Patent through the customers’ normal and customary use of the Accused Products.” Plaintiff also alleged that “Samsung’s infringing activities have injured and will continue to injure Plaintiff, unless and until this Court enters an injunction prohibiting further infringement of the ’014 Patent, and, specifically, enjoining further manufacture, use, sale, importation, and/or offers for sale that come within the scope of the patent claims.”

 

There are two claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, which are for the infringement of one or more claims of ‘014 Patent and ‘241 Patent.

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court to pass an order that Samsung has infringed, either literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents, the ’014 and ’241 Patents, permanent injunction against Samsung for further acts of infringement. Plaintiff further requested the court to award damages to Plaintiff along with pre-judgment and post-judgment interest, to pass an order finding that this is an exceptional case within the meaning

of 35 U.S.C. § 285 and also requiring Samsung to provide an accounting and to pay supplemental damages to Plaintiff along with costs of action. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00169

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonrai Memory Limited

Defendants

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brian D. Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W. Conkle

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam and Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonrai Memory Limited. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (am) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (am) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Cases by Sonrai Memory Limited (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14516810), filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

9 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. answer due 6/28/2021. (lad) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.s Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement. After considering same, the Court is ofthe opinion that the Motion should be GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and SamsungElectronics America, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby extended up to and including June 28, 2021.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonrai Memory Limited. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (am) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (am) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (am) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Cases by Sonrai Memory Limited (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14516810), filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sonrai Memory Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Ma