This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2022 at 07:18:56 (UTC).

Sonrai Memory Limited v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 Sonrai Memory Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00189

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonrai Memory Limited

Defendants

Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacob R. Buczko

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Amy Hayden

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd. Floor 12

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brian D. Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W. Conkle

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

David T. Shackelford

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

James Milkey

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

F. Christopher Mizzo

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 2004

Carrie L. Williamson

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

2000 University Avenue

East Palo Alto, CA 94303-2214

Peter Maggiore

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

401 B Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

John Michael Guaragna

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

303 Colorado Street, Suite 3000

Austin, TX 78701

Barbara N. Barath

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

555 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Brent K. Yamashita

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

2000 University Avenue

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Christian Chessman

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

2000 University Avenue, Suite 100

East Palo Alto, CA 94303-2214

Gregory S. Arovas

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Mark D. Fowler

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

2000 University Avenue

East Palo Alto, CA 94303-2214

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam and Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Patrick S. Park

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

2000 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 400 North Tower

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) ORDER STAYING CASE in 6:21-cv-00169. Sonrais 241 patent claims directed to the Accused Kioxia andWestern Digital Chip is severed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21, and that severed action is stayed pending resolution of the Kioxia Action and Western DigitalAction. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT from 6:21-cv-00169, filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Errata 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(lad) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

2 #1

Exhibit 1

2 #2

Errata 2

2 #3

Exhibit 3

2 #4

Exhibit 4

2 #5

Exhibit 5

2 #6

Exhibit 6

2 #7

Exhibit 7

2 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ORDER re #1 Order Staying Case,. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hayden, Amy) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#5

(#5) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 04/14/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hayden, Amy) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER re #1 Order Staying Case,. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT from 6:21-cv-00169, filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Errata 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(lad) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER STAYING CASE in 6:21-cv-00169. Sonrais 241 patent claims directed to the Accused Kioxia andWestern Digital Chip is severed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21, and that severed action is stayed pending resolution of the Kioxia Action and Western DigitalAction. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sonrai Memory Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carrie Lynne Williamson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brent K. Yamashita