This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2021 at 08:12:02 (UTC).

Sonrai Memory Limited v. Oracle Corp.

Case Summary

On October, 01, 2021, Sonrai Memory Limited (“Sonrai” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Reza Mirzaie of Russ August & Kabat, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Oracle Corp., (“Defendant”), seeking injunctive relief and damages along with pre-judgement and post-judgement interest and costs for the alleged infringement of the United States Patent owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 8,193,792 (“’792 Patent” or the “Asserted Patent”) entitled “Circuit and method for operating a circuit.” owned by the Plaintiff.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Plaintiff owns by assignment all rights, title, and interest in U.S. Patent No. 8,193,792, entitled “Circuit and method for operating a circuit.” The ’792 Patent was duly and legally issued by the United States Patent and Trademark Office on June 5, 2012. A true and correct copy of the ’792 Patent is attached as Exhibit 1.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “On information and belief, Defendant makes, uses, offers for sale, sells, and/or imports certain products and services, including without limitation servers and services utilizing Intel processors with Fully Integrated Voltage Regulators (e.g., Exadata servers and Oracle services such as Oracle Cloud Infrastructure, Oracle Cluster Networking, and Oracle Cloud at Customer) (“Accused Instrumentalities”), that directly infringe, literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents, one or more claims of the ’792 Patent.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Defendant also knowingly and intentionally induces infringement of one or more claims of the ’792 Patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271 (b). Through the filing and service of this Complaint, Defendant has had knowledge of the ’792 Patent and the infringing nature of the Accused Instrumentalities. Despite this knowledge of the ’792 Patent, Defendant continues to actively encourage and instruct its customers and end users (for example, through user manuals and online instruction materials on its website) to use the Accused Instrumentalities in ways that directly infringe the ’792 Patent. Defendant does so knowing and intending that its customers and end users will commit these infringing acts. Defendant also continues to make, use, offer for sale, sell, and/or import the Accused Instrumentalities, despite its knowledge of the ’792 Patent, thereby specifically intending for and inducing its customers to infringe the ’792 Patent through the customers’ normal and customary use of the Accused Instrumentalities.”

 

There is only one claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff which deals with the alleged infringement of ’792 Patent.

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court to pass a judgement in favour of Plaintiff, finding that Defendant has infringed either literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents, the ’792 Patent and find that the present case is exceptional case within the meaning of 35 U.S.C. § 285. The Plaintiff also requested the Court to award damages, including supplemental damages, to Plaintiff along with pre-judgement and post-judgement interest, costs, expenses and reasonable attorneys’ fees, and any other relief that the Court deems appropriate. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01023

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonrai Memory Limited

Defendant

Oracle Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Amy Hayden

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd. Floor 12

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brian D. Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W. Conkle

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

J. Stephen Ravel

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

303 Colorado Streetsuite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Oracle Corp.. Attorney J. Stephen Ravel added to party Oracle Corp.(pty:dft) (Ravel, J.) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE Regarding Agreed Extension to Respond to the Complaint by Oracle Corp. re #1 Complaint (Ravel, J.) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

2 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Oracle Corp. answer due 12/10/2021. (lad) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE Regarding Agreed Extension to Respond to the Complaint by Oracle Corp. re #1 Complaint (Ravel, J.) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Oracle Corp.. Attorney J. Stephen Ravel added to party Oracle Corp.(pty:dft) (Ravel, J.) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonrai Memory Limited. Oracle Corp. served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Hayden, Amy) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Oracle Corp.. (lad) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Sonrai Memory Limited re #1 Complaint (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AGAINST ORACLE CORP. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15290410), filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sonrai Memory Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Oracle Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Stephen Ravel