This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/27/2022 at 08:29:52 (UTC).

Sonrai Memory Limited v. Motorola Mobility LLC

Case Summary

On 03/28/2022 Sonrai Memory Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Motorola Mobility LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine E. Bucklo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01606

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elaine E. Bucklo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonrai Memory Limited

Defendant

Motorola Mobility LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George N. Vurdelja, Jr.

Attorney at Harrison & Held

333 S. Wacker, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60606

James Milkey

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Amy E Hayden

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W Conkle

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

David T Schakelford

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Paul A Kroeger

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Erin P. Gibson

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

401 B Street, Room 1700

San Diego, CA 92101-4297

Ferlillia V. Roberson

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP US

444 West Lake Street, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60606-0089

Sean C Cunningham

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

401 B Street, Room 1700

San Diego, CA 92101-4297

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19499219. (Gibson, Erin) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#21

(#21) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19499179. (Cunningham, Sean) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#20

(#20) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Limited by George N. Vurdelja, Jr (Vurdelja, George) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Motorola Mobility LLC(Roberson, Ferlillia) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#18

(#18) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Motorola Mobility LLC (Roberson, Ferlillia) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION regarding complaint #1 - Stipulation For Extension Of Time (Roberson, Ferlillia) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#16

(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC by Ferlillia V. Roberson (Roberson, Ferlillia) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonrai Memory Limited as to Motorola Mobility LLC on 3/31/2022, answer due 4/21/2022. (Hayden, Amy) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19340056. for James A. Milkey (Milkey, James) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#11

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motions to appear pro hac vice #8 #9 #10 #11 #12 #13 are granted. Scheduling conference set for 7/8/2022 at 09:45 AM (to track the case only; no appearance required). Joint Rule 26(f) planning report due 6/28/2022. (The form of the report can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.) The court will set a schedule based on the report. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#7

(#7) MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jn, ) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#6

(#6) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Limited regarding complaint #1 (Vurdelja, George) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Related Cases by Sonrai Memory Limited (Vurdelja, George) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#3

(#3) Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement STATEMENT by Sonrai Memory Limited (Vurdelja, George) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

2 #1

Exhibit 1

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vurdelja, George) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#1

(#17) STIPULATION regarding complaint #1 - Stipulation For Extension Of Time (Roberson, Ferlillia) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#5

(#5) Local Rule 3.4 by Sonrai Memory Limited (Vurdelja, George) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19499219. (Gibson, Erin) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19499179. (Cunningham, Sean) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Limited by George N. Vurdelja, Jr (Vurdelja, George) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Motorola Mobility LLC(Roberson, Ferlillia) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Motorola Mobility LLC (Roberson, Ferlillia) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION regarding complaint #1 - Stipulation For Extension Of Time (Roberson, Ferlillia) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC by Ferlillia V. Roberson (Roberson, Ferlillia) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonrai Memory Limited as to Motorola Mobility LLC on 3/31/2022, answer due 4/21/2022. (Hayden, Amy) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motions to appear pro hac vice #8 #9 #10 #11 #12 #13 are granted. Scheduling conference set for 7/8/2022 at 09:45 AM (to track the case only; no appearance required). Joint Rule 26(f) planning report due 6/28/2022. (The form of the report can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.) The court will set a schedule based on the report. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19340056. for James A. Milkey (Milkey, James) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC (ak, ) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jn, ) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Limited regarding complaint #1 (Vurdelja, George) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Local Rule 3.4 by Sonrai Memory Limited (Vurdelja, George) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Related Cases by Sonrai Memory Limited (Vurdelja, George) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lw, ) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, ) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement STATEMENT by Sonrai Memory Limited (Vurdelja, George) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vurdelja, George) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement Against Motorola Mobility LLC filed by Sonrai Memory Limited; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19287840.(Vurdelja, George) (Docket text modified on 3/28/2022 (nsf, ). (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sonrai Memory Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where MOTOROLA MOBILITY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ferlillia V. Roberson