This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/15/2022 at 12:43:05 (UTC).

Sonrai Memory Limited v. Micron Technology, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/16/2022 Sonrai Memory Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Micron Technology, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Fred Biery. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00855

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fred Biery

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonrai Memory Limited

Defendant

Micron Technology, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Hayden

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd. Floor 12

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brett E Cooper

Attorney at BC LAW GROUP, P.C.

200 Madison Avenue, 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Christian W. Conkle

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Drew B Hollander

Attorney at BC Law Group, P.C.

200 Madison Avenue, 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

James Milkey

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Randy Yim

Attorney at BC Law Group, P.C.

200 Madison Avenue, 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Seth Raymond Hasenour

Attorney at BC Law Group, P.C.

607 Terrell Hill Drive, Ste Unit B

Austin, TX 78704

Defendant Attorney

Adam R. Shartzer

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

1000 Maine Avenue Sw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20024

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Randy Yim on behalf of Sonrai Memory Limited. Attorney Jonathan Randy Yim added to party Sonrai Memory Limited(pty:pla) (Yim, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Drew B Hollander on behalf of Sonrai Memory Limited. Attorney Drew B Hollander added to party Sonrai Memory Limited(pty:pla) (Hollander, Drew) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Raymond Hasenour on behalf of Sonrai Memory Limited. Attorney Seth Raymond Hasenour added to party Sonrai Memory Limited(pty:pla) (Hasenour, Seth) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

17 #6

Exhibit K

17 #5

Exhibit J

17 #4

Exhibit I

17 #3

Exhibit H

17 #2

Exhibit G

17 #17

Main Document

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Randy Yim on behalf of Sonrai Memory Limited. Attorney Jonathan Randy Yim added to party Sonrai Memory Limited(pty:pla) (Yim, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Drew B Hollander on behalf of Sonrai Memory Limited. Attorney Drew B Hollander added to party Sonrai Memory Limited(pty:pla) (Hollander, Drew) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Raymond Hasenour on behalf of Sonrai Memory Limited. Attorney Seth Raymond Hasenour added to party Sonrai Memory Limited(pty:pla) (Hasenour, Seth) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Sonrai Memory Limited, re #8 MOTION TO RELATE AND REASSIGN CASE filed by Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Limited (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brett Cooper, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J, #6 Exhibit K)(Cooper, Brett) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Micron Technology, Inc., re #8 MOTION TO RELATE AND REASSIGN CASE filed by Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Limited (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Adam R. Shartzer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Proposed Order)(Shartzer, Adam) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #8 MOTION TO RELATE AND REASSIGN CASE . Defendant Micron Technology, Inc. shall have, as requested, until Thursday, September 15, 2022, to file a response. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (lad) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION TO RELATE AND REASSIGN CASE by Micron Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shartzer, Adam) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam R. Shartzer on behalf of Micron Technology, Inc.. Attorney Adam R. Shartzer added to party Micron Technology, Inc.(pty:dft) (Shartzer, Adam) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, ; Micron Technology, Inc. answer due 10/24/2022. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (lad) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett E Cooper on behalf of Sonrai Memory Limited. Attorney Brett E Cooper added to party Sonrai Memory Limited(pty:pla) (Cooper, Brett) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hayden, Amy) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION TO RELATE AND REASSIGN CASE by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Of Amy E. Hayden, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order)(Hayden, Amy) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonrai Memory Limited. Micron Technology, Inc. served on 8/17/2022, answer due 9/7/2022. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Micron Technology, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Sonrai Memory Limited re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Fred Biery pursuant to the Order Assigning Business of the Court as it Relates to Patent Cases, filed 7/25/2022. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AGAINST MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16410370), filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sonrai Memory Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Shartzer