This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2021 at 06:57:22 (UTC).

Sonrai Memory Limited v. LG Electronics Inc. et al

Case Summary

On July 30, 2021, Sonrai Memory Ltd. (“Plaintiff” or “Sonrai”), represented by Reza Mirzaie of Russ August & Kabat filed an intellectual property lawsuit against LG Electronics Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (collectively, “LG” or “Defendant”), seeking declaratory relief, compensatory and supplemental damages among other reliefs for the alleged infringement of the United States patents owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas Alan D. Albright presiding.  

 

Plaintiff filed this complaint for Defendant’s alleged unlawful infringement of the following United States patents owned by Sonrai: United States Patents Nos. 7,159,766 (“the ’766 Patent,”), 7,325,733 (“the ’733 Patent,”), and 8,193,792 (“the ’792 Patent,”) (collectively, the “Asserted Patents”).

 

In its complaint, Plaintiff alleged that “LG offers for sale, sells, and/or imports certain products (“Accused Products”), such as laptops and desktops with Windows Modern Standby and mobile phones and tablets supporting Android Doze, including for example the LG V40 and LG gram 15, that directly infringe, literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents, one or more claims of the ’766 Patent.”

 

Plaintiff further alleged that “LG also knowingly and intentionally induces infringement of one or more claims of the ’766 Patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(b). Through the filing and service of this Complaint, and also through the filing and service of a complaint with the United States International Trade Commission (ITC) pursuant to Section 337 of the Tariff Act of 1930, 19 U.S.C. § 1337, LG has had knowledge of the ’766 Patent and the infringing nature of the Accused Products. Despite this knowledge of the ’766 Patent, LG continues to actively encourage and instruct its customers and end users (for example, through user manuals and online instruction materials on their website) to use the Accused Products in ways that directly infringe the ’766 Patent. LG does so knowing and intending that its customers and end users will commit these infringing acts.”

 

Plaintiff also alleged that “By making, using, offering for sale, selling and/or importing into the United States the Accused Products, LG has injured Sonrai and is liable for infringement of the ’766 Patent pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 271.”

 

There are three claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The first claim alleged is for the infringement of the ‘766 Patent, the second claim alleged is for the infringement of the ‘733 Patent and the third claim alleged is for the infringement of the ‘792 Patent. 

 

In its prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested the Court to hold that Defendants have infringed the ’766 Patent, the ’733 Patent, and the ’792 Patent and order Defendant to pay damages together with prejudgment and post-judgment interest. Plaintiff further requested the Court to order an accounting, to award supplemental damages to Sonrai, find this case exceptional and award costs of litigation. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00791

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonrai Memory Limited

Defendants

LG Electronics Inc.

LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Amy Hayden

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd. Floor 12

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W. Conkle

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

James Milkey

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

J. Stephen Ravel

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

8 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: LG Electronics Inc. answer due 10/25/2021; LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. answer due 10/25/2021. (ir) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE Regarding Agreed Extension to Respond to the Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Ravel, J.) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney J. Stephen Ravel added to party LG Electronics Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney J. Stephen Ravel added to party LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft) (Ravel, J.) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonrai Memory Limited. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. served on 8/5/2021, answer due 8/26/2021. (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to LG Electronics Inc. (ir) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (ir) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ir) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Sonrai Memory Limited re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AGAINST LG ELECTRONICS INC.; LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15070099), filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sonrai Memory Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Stephen Ravel