This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2022 at 07:23:02 (UTC).

Sonrai Memory Limited v. Lenovo Group Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On January 7, 2022, Sonrai Memory Limited (“Plaintiff” or “Sonrai”), represented by Amy Hayden, Brian D. Ledahl, Christian W. Conkle, James Milkey, Jonathan Ma, Marc A. Fenster and Reza Mirzaie of Russ August & Kabat, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Lenovo Group Ltd. and Motorola Mobility LLC (“Defendants”), seeking damages, costs and expenses along with pre- and post-judgement interest for the Defendants’ alleged infringement of the United States Patent owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 6,874,014 (“’014 Patent” or the “Asserted Patent”) entitled “Chip Multiprocessor with Multiple Operating Systems.” owned by the Plaintiff.

In the complaint the Plaintiff alleged that, “Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Limited is a limited liability company organized and existing under the law of Ireland, with its principal place of business at The Hyde Building, Suite 23, The Park, Carrickmines, Dublin 18, Ireland. Sonrai is the sole owner by assignment of all right, title, and interest in the Asserted Patent. On information and belief, Defendant Lenovo Group Ltd. is organized under the laws of the People’s Republic of China, with its principal place of business at 6 Chuang ye Road, Haidan District, Beijing 100085, China. On information and belief, Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC is a limited liability company organized under the laws of the State of Delaware, with its principal office at 222 W. Merchandise Mart Plaza, Suite 1800, Chicago, Illinois 60654. This complaint arises from Defendants’ unlawful infringement of the following United States patent owned by Plaintiff, which relates to improvements in computer chip architecture having multiple processors on a single die: United States Patent No. 6,874,014.”

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “On information and belief, Defendants make, use, offer for sale, sell, and/or import certain products and services, including without limitation mobile phones with Qualcomm Snapdragon SoCs containing at least one Hexagon DSP, including without limitation the Motorola Edge (“Accused Products”), that directly infringe, literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents, one or more claims of the ’014 Patent. The Accused Products satisfy all claim limitations of one or more claims of the ’014 Patent. By making, using, offering for sale, selling and/or importing into the United States the Accused Products, Defendants have injured Plaintiff and is liable for infringement of the ’014 Patent pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 271.”

The only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff deals with the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 6,874,014, owned by the Plaintiff.

In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court for a judgment in favor of Plaintiff that each Defendant has infringed, either literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents, the ’014 Patent; an order requiring each Defendant, jointly and severally, to pay Plaintiff its damages, costs, expenses, and pre- and post-judgment interest for Defendants’ infringement of the ’014 Patent; and an order finding that this is an exceptional case within the meaning of 35 U.S.C. § 285 and award to Plaintiff its reasonable attorneys’ fees against Defendants, jointly and severally, along with any and all other relief as the Court may deem appropriate and just under the circumstances.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00029

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonrai Memory Limited

Defendants

Lenovo Group Ltd.

Motorola Mobility LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Milkey

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Amy Hayden

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd. Floor 12

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brian D. Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W. Conkle

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

John Michael Guaragna

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

303 Colorado Street, Suite 3000

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15594638), filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Cases by Sonrai Memory Limited (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Lenovo Group Ltd.. (lad) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Motorola Mobility LLC. (lad) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonrai Memory Limited. Motorola Mobility LLC served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. (Hayden, Amy) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Unopposed Extension of Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Motorola Mobility LLC re #1 Complaint (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

2 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Motorola Mobility LLC answer due 3/28/2022. (jc5) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Unopposed Extension of Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Motorola Mobility LLC re #1 Complaint (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonrai Memory Limited. Motorola Mobility LLC served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. (Hayden, Amy) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Motorola Mobility LLC. (lad) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Lenovo Group Ltd.. (lad) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Cases by Sonrai Memory Limited (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15594638), filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sonrai Memory Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where MOTOROLA MOBILITY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lenovo Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Michael Guaragna