This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2022 at 07:55:51 (UTC).

Sonrai Memory Limited v. Kingston Technology Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 Sonrai Memory Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Kingston Technology Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00192

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonrai Memory Limited

Defendants

Kingston Technology Company, Inc.

Kingston Technology Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacob R. Buczko

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

James Milkey

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Amy Hayden

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd. Floor 12

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brian D. Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W. Conkle

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

David T. Shackelford

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

David M. Hoffman

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 810

Austin, TX 78701

Christine Yang

Attorney at Law Offices of S. J. Christine Yang

17220 Newhope Street, Suite 101-102

Fountain Valley, CA 92708

Jeanel N. Sunga

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

500 Arguello Street, Suite 400

Redwood City, CA 94063

Victoria Hao

Attorney at Law Offices of S. J. Christine Yang

17220 Newhope Street, Suites 101-102

Fountain Valley, CA 92708

Martha J. H. Harlow

Attorney at Law Office of Martha J. H. Harlow

271 Hopkins Way

Summersville, WV 26651

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) ORDER to Sever/STAY CASE from 6:21-cv-01284. Sonrais 241 patent claims against Kingston (Count I) are severed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21, and that severed action is stayed pending resolution of the Kioxia Action and Western Digital Action. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT in 6:21-cv-01284, filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet from CA case)(lad) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

2 #1

Exhibit 1

2 #2

Exhibit 2

2 #3

Exhibit 3

2 #4

Exhibit 4

2 #5

Civil Cover Sheet from CA case

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hayden, Amy) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#4

(#4) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 04/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hayden, Amy) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT in 6:21-cv-01284, filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet from CA case)(lad) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER to Sever/STAY CASE from 6:21-cv-01284. Sonrais 241 patent claims against Kingston (Count I) are severed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21, and that severed action is stayed pending resolution of the Kioxia Action and Western Digital Action. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sonrai Memory Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where KINGSTON TECHNOLOGY COMPANY INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christine Yang

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Victoria D. Hao