This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/08/2022 at 10:12:50 (UTC).

Sonrai Memory Limited v. Kingston Technology Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 Sonrai Memory Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Kingston Technology Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01284

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonrai Memory Limited

Defendants

Kingston Technology Company, Inc.

Kingston Technology Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Amy Hayden

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd. Floor 12

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brian D. Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W. Conkle

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

David T. Shackelford

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jacob R. Buczko

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

James Milkey

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Jeanel N. Sunga

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

500 Arguello Street, Suite 400

Redwood City, CA 94063

Martha J. H. Harlow

Attorney at Law Office of Martha J. H. Harlow

271 Hopkins Way

Summersville, WV 26651

Victoria Hao

Attorney at Law Offices of S. J. Christine Yang

17220 Newhope Street, Suites 101-102

Fountain Valley, CA 92708

David M. Hoffman

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 810

Austin, TX 78701

Christine Yang

Attorney at Law Offices of S. J. Christine Yang

17220 Newhope Street, Suite 101-102

Fountain Valley, CA 92708

 

Court Documents

#59

(#59) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Kingston Technology Company, Inc., Kingston Technology Corporation, re #47 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of Plaintiff's Manufacturer Lawsuits filed by Defendant Kingston Technology Company, Inc., Defendant Kingston Technology Corporation (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

47 #19

Exhibit G

47 #18

Exhibit F

47 #15

Exhibit C

47 #11

Amazon Declaration of Rogers

47 #10

Western Digital Declaration of McElroy

47 #7

Samsung Declaration of Koo

47 #3

Apple Declaration of Rollins

47 #2

Western Digital Declaration of Fasoli

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#4

(#4) Certification And Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Limited, (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#3

(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/11/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/11/2021)

176 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Kingston Technology Company, Inc., Kingston Technology Corporation, re #47 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of Plaintiff's Manufacturer Lawsuits filed by Defendant Kingston Technology Company, Inc., Defendant Kingston Technology Corporation (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) ORDER GRANTING #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (tada) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman for Jeanel N. Sunga ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15660586) by on behalf of Kingston Technology Company, Inc., Kingston Technology Corporation. (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ORDER GRANTING #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jzda) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) ORDER GRANTING #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jzda) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Sonrai Memory Limited, re #47 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of Plaintiff's Manufacturer Lawsuits filed by Defendant Kingston Technology Company, Inc., Defendant Kingston Technology Corporation (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Amy E. Hayden, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45)(Hayden, Amy) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David T. Shackelford on behalf of Sonrai Memory Limited (Shackelford, David) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman for Victoria Hao ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15628639) by on behalf of Kingston Technology Company, Inc., Kingston Technology Corporation. (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman for Christine Yang ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15628608) by on behalf of Kingston Technology Company, Inc., Kingston Technology Corporation. (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 6/16/2022 before Judge Alan D Albright. Joinder of Parties due by 7/28/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 9/26/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 3/23/2023. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Related Cases filed by Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Limited (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification And Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Limited, (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31455600 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Sonrai Memory Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Attorney Reza Mirzaie added to party Sonrai Memory Limited(pty:pla))(Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sonrai Memory Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christine Yang

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Victoria D. Hao