This case was last updated from PACER on 06/22/2021 at 16:33:04 (UTC).

Sonrai Memory Limited v. Apple Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 Sonrai Memory Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00401

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonrai Memory Limited

Defendant

Apple Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W. Conkle

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

James Milkey

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brian D. Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonrai Memory Limited. Apple Inc. served on 4/27/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Ma for James A. Milkey ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14744226) by on behalf of Sonrai Memory Limited. (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Related Cases by Sonrai Memory Limited (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14733808), filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James Milkey for Sonrai Memory Limited. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonrai Memory Limited. Apple Inc. served on 4/27/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Ma for James A. Milkey ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14744226) by on behalf of Sonrai Memory Limited. (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Related Cases by Sonrai Memory Limited (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14733808), filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sonrai Memory Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christian W. Conkle