This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/30/2022 at 08:28:29 (UTC).

Sonrai Memory Limited v. Amazon.Com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 Sonrai Memory Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Amazon Com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00225

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonrai Memory Limited

Defendant

Amazon.Com, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christian W. Conkle

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

David T. Shackelford

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jacob R. Buczko

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

James Milkey

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Amy Hayden

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd. Floor 12

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Stefani E. Shanberg

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jacob Nathaniel Nagy

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20037

John S. Douglass

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Nathan B. Sabri

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster, LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Robin L. Brewer

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster, LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) ORDER Severing case 6:21-cv-00991 and staying this case. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT (filed as Amended Complaint at doc 15 in 6:21-cv-00991), filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(lad) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

2 #1

Exhibit 1

2 #2

Exhibit 2

2 #3

Exhibit 3

2 #4

Exhibit 4

2 #5

Exhibit 5

2 #6

Exhibit 6

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hayden, Amy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#4

(#4) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 04/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hayden, Amy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCase Stayed (lad) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT (filed as Amended Complaint at doc 15 in 6:21-cv-00991), filed by Sonrai Memory Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(lad) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER Severing case 6:21-cv-00991 and staying this case. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sonrai Memory Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robin Lynn Brewer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stefani Elise Shanberg