This case was last updated from PACER on 11/21/2021 at 09:24:33 (UTC).

Sonnier v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 Sonnier filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire Casualty Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03379

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tina Sonnier

Defendant

State Farm Fire & Casualty Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Craig Jones

Attorney at Jones & Hill

131 Hwy 165 S

Oakdale, LA 71463

Craig Ray Hill

Attorney at Jones & Hill (OB)

P O Box 1260

Oberlin, LA 70655

Defendant Attorneys

Gordon Page Guthrie, III

Attorney at Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (NO)

704 Carondelet St

New Orleans, LA 70130

Charles L Chassaignac, IV

Attorney at Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (BR)

301 St Charles St

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Eleanor Weeks Wall

Attorney at Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (BR)

301 St Charles St

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Emily S Morrison

Attorney at Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (BR)

301 St Charles St

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#2

2 #1

Exhibit A

2 #2

Exhibit B

#3

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Sonnier. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (aty,Jones, John) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent sought but not yet obtained by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Exhibit Service of Process)(Attorney Gordon Page Guthrie, III added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Guthrie, Gordon) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

5 #1

Order

5 #2

Exhibit Service of Process

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co Corporate Parent for State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Guthrie, Gordon) Modified to add corporate parent on 10/12/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit service of process)(aty,Guthrie, Gordon) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

7 #1

Exhibit service of process

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, State Farm Fire & Casualty Co answer due 11/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/20/2021. (crt,Benoit, T) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Guthrie, Gordon) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, State Farm Fire & Casualty Co answer due 11/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/20/2021. (crt,Benoit, T) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent sought but not yet obtained . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit service of process)(aty,Guthrie, Gordon) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co Corporate Parent for State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Guthrie, Gordon) Modified to add corporate parent on 10/12/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent sought but not yet obtained by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Exhibit Service of Process)(Attorney Gordon Page Guthrie, III added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Guthrie, Gordon) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Sonnier. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (aty,Jones, John) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketJudge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay added. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire & Casualty (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4828195) filed by Tina Sonnier. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John Craig Jones added to party Tina Sonnier(pty:pla))(aty,Jones, John) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant