This case was last updated from PACER on 05/01/2020 at 07:58:22 (UTC).

Sonic Industries LLC et al v. Simple Tie Ventures LP et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 Sonic Industries LLC filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Simple Tie Ventures LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott L. Palk and Bernard Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00183

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Scott L. Palk

Bernard Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Sonic Industries LLC

Sonic Industries Services Inc

Sonic Franchising LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Tanger Restco LP

Lancthree LLC

MONT2 LLC

Maribou LLC

Jeffrey B Solomon

Berkstwo LLC

MONT1 LLC

DJTM LLC

Donald R Welsh

Lanctwo LLC

Schaum's Restco LP

Rapho Restco LP

Limerick Restco LP

Cross Restco LP

Madk LP

Chestone LLC

MONT3 LLC

42 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Joe M Hampton

Attorney at Hampton Barghols Pierce PLLC

210 Park Avenue, Suite 2700

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Amy J Pierce

Attorney at Hampton Barghols Pierce PLLC

210 Park Avenue, Suite 2700

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

John F Verhey

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP - CHICAGO

444 W Lake St, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Russell C Lissuzzo, III

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Zachary A P Oubre

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Michael K Avery

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#59

(#59) ORDER ~ A review reveals that no LP or LLC Defendant has filed a disclosure statement in compliance with Local Civil Rule 7.1.1. The Court therefore ORDERS the twenty-four LP or LLC Defendants to file their disclosure statements within seven days, or no later than May 5, 2020. Signed by Honorable Bernard Jones on 4/28/2020. (dwl) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

58 #2

Exhibit 2 - 6th Royalty and Ad Coop Waiver

58 #1

Exhibit 1- March 5, 2020 Willson Letter

#58

(#58) REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- March 5, 2020 Willson Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - 6th Royalty and Ad Coop Waiver)(Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#57

(#57) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Industries LLC, America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC. Willow Grove Restco LP served on 3/17/2020. (Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#56

(#56) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Industries LLC, America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC. Upland Restco LP served on 3/17/2020. (Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#55

(#55) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Industries LLC, America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC. Tanger Restco LP served on 3/17/2020. (Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

17 #1

Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order

#17

(#58) REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- March 5, 2020 Willson Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - 6th Royalty and Ad Coop Waiver)(Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Joe M Hampton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

5 #2

Exhibit 2 - Trademark Registration List

5 #1

Exhibit 1 - Verification of Eddie Saroch

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Verification of Eddie Saroch, #2 Exhibit 2 - Trademark Registration List)(Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case Reassigned to the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman. Honorable Scott L. Palk no longer assigned. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 3/3/2020. (md) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Scott L. Palk recused. Case reassigned to Honorable Jodi W. Dishman for all further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 3/3/2020. (md) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (rb) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Industries LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER ~ A review reveals that no LP or LLC Defendant has filed a disclosure statement in compliance with Local Civil Rule 7.1.1. The Court therefore ORDERS the twenty-four LP or LLC Defendants to file their disclosure statements within seven days, or no later than May 5, 2020. Signed by Honorable Bernard Jones on 4/28/2020. (dwl) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- March 5, 2020 Willson Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - 6th Royalty and Ad Coop Waiver)(Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Industries LLC, America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC. Willow Grove Restco LP served on 3/17/2020. (Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Industries LLC, America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC. Upland Restco LP served on 3/17/2020. (Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Industries LLC, America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC. Tanger Restco LP served on 3/17/2020. (Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Industries LLC, America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC. Simple Tie Ventures LP served on 3/17/2020. (Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Industries LLC, America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC. Schaum's Restco LP served on 3/17/2020. (Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Industries LLC, America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC. Rapho Restco LP served on 3/17/2020. (Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Industries LLC, America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC. Ox Restco LP served on 3/17/2020. (Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Industries LLC, America's Drive-In Brand Properties LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC. MONT3 LLC served on 3/17/2020. (Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, provided counsel, as instructed by LCvR83.2(g), submits an ECF registration form and, upon activation, electronically files an entry of appearance consistent with LCvR83.4. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 03/06/2020. (nv) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John F. Verhey Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3113733 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice Form for John Verhey)(Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Amy J Pierce on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pierce, Amy) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Joe M Hampton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Verification of Eddie Saroch, #2 Exhibit 2 - Trademark Registration List)(Hampton, Joe) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case Reassigned to the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman. Honorable Scott L. Palk no longer assigned. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 3/3/2020. (md) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Scott L. Palk recused. Case reassigned to Honorable Jodi W. Dishman for all further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 3/3/2020. (md) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3108784. (Pierce, Amy) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (rb) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Industries LLC, Sonic Franchising LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sonic Franchising LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SONIC INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John F Verhey