This case was last updated from PACER on 03/25/2020 at 07:02:59 (UTC).

Soni v. Navistar, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2020 Soni filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Navistar, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00584

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pardeep Soni

Defendant

Navistar, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pasha Vaziri

Attorney at Vaziri Law LLC

111 W. Washington St., Ste. 1500

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vaziri, Pasha) (Entered: 01/25/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit Right to Sue

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pardeep Soni by Pasha Vaziri (Vaziri, Pasha) (Entered: 01/25/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Pardeep Soni; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16654843. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge, #2 Exhibit Right to Sue)(Vaziri, Pasha) (Entered: 01/25/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit Charge

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, ) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, ) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, ) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pardeep Soni by Pasha Vaziri (Vaziri, Pasha) (Entered: 01/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vaziri, Pasha) (Entered: 01/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Pardeep Soni; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16654843. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge, #2 Exhibit Right to Sue)(Vaziri, Pasha) (Entered: 01/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less