This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 13:39:12 (UTC).

Song Yune v. Shah Nazat Farooq et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 Song Yune filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Shah Nazat Farooq. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Manuel L. Real and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04223

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manuel L. Real

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Song Yune

Defendants

ADVANCED MUSICAL PROPERTIES

Does 1 to 10

Shah Nazat Farooq doing business as Venice Market

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin Hyunjong Hong

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

06/12/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Song Yune. (Hong, Kevin) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (cch) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Advanced Musical Properties, Shah Nazat Farooq. (ghap) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Song Yune, (Hong, Kevin) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Song Yune. (Hong, Kevin) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Song Yune. (Hong, Kevin) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23746617 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Song Yune. (Attorney Kevin Hyunjong Hong added to party Song Yune(pty:pla))(Hong, Kevin) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less