This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2020 at 09:21:22 (UTC).

Song v. BMW of North America, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 Song filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dana M. Sabraw and Bernard G. Skomal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02025

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana M. Sabraw

Referral Judge

Bernard G. Skomal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zhuoyang Song

Defendants

DOES 1-100

BMW of North America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lior Sadgan

Attorney at Law Offices of Lior Sadgan

15250 Ventura Blvd., Suite 1110

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Defendant Attorneys

Kate S. Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard, 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER Re: #8 Remand of Removed Action. The Stipulation is approved. Southern District of California case number 3:20-cv-02025 DMS (BGS), Zhuoyang Song v. BMW of North America, LLC is hereby remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Northwest District. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/23/2020. [Certified order mailed to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Northwest District] (mme)(jrd) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

8 #1

Supplement Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Joint MOTION to Remand ; Stipulation and Proposed Order by BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Order)(Bruce Chinery, Jacqueline)Attorney Jacqueline Bruce Chinery added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft)*QC Mailer sent re proposed order should not be attached* (mme). (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Zhuoyang Song re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court of California, County of Los Angeles . Identifying Other Affiliate Vistacal Luxury Imports, Inc. DBA BMW of Vista for Zhuoyang Song. (Sadgan, Lior) (mme). (Entered: 11/13/2020)

6 #3

Exhibit A-G

6 #2

Declaration of Lior Sadgan

6 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities

#6

(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court of California, County of Los Angeles by Zhuoyang Song. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Lior Sadgan, #3 Exhibit A-G)(Sadgan, Lior) (mme). (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/13/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Joint Discovery Plan due 12/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 11/3/2020.(mme) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

1 #9

Exhibit H

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Re: #8 Remand of Removed Action. The Stipulation is approved. Southern District of California case number 3:20-cv-02025 DMS (BGS), Zhuoyang Song v. BMW of North America, LLC is hereby remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Northwest District. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/23/2020. [Certified order mailed to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Northwest District] (mme)(jrd) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION to Remand ; Stipulation and Proposed Order by BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Order)(Bruce Chinery, Jacqueline)Attorney Jacqueline Bruce Chinery added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft)*QC Mailer sent re proposed order should not be attached* (mme). (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Zhuoyang Song re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court of California, County of Los Angeles . Identifying Other Affiliate Vistacal Luxury Imports, Inc. DBA BMW of Vista for Zhuoyang Song. (Sadgan, Lior) (mme). (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court of California, County of Los Angeles by Zhuoyang Song. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Lior Sadgan, #3 Exhibit A-G)(Sadgan, Lior) (mme). (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/13/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Joint Discovery Plan due 12/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 11/3/2020.(mme) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by BMW of North America, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, Identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp. as corporate parent (Lehrman, Kate) (anh). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BMW of North America, LLC. (Lehrman, Kate) (anh). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by BMW of North America, LLC. (smd) (sjt). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of Los Angeles, Northwest District, case number 20VECV00715. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14683327.), filed by BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2025-DMS-BGS. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kate S Lehrman