This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2022 at 08:03:49 (UTC).

Song et al v. T-Mobile USA Inc ***Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-3019.***

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 Song filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against T-Mobile USA Inc Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4 21-md-3019. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian C. Wimes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00908

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian C. Wimes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Linda Song

Rachel Gurley

Andrew Luna

Mario Gordon

Melani Gordon

Defendant

T-Mobile USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason T Dennett

Kaleigh N.B. Powell

Kim D Stephens

Defendant Attorneys

Kristine McAlister Brown

Kathleen M O'Sullivan

Lauren Jeffers Tsuji

Steve Y Koh

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Proceedings pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/17/2021)

15 #1

*Restricted*

15 #15

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

14 #1

CTO email

14 #14

Main Document

#11

(#11) Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Stay Proceedings pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#10

(#10) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristine McAlister Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7335363 (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steve Y Koh on behalf of Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on T-Mobile USA Inc on 11/3/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Mario Gordon, Melani Gordon, Rachel Gurley, Andrew Luna, Linda Song. (Stephens, Kim) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER: This action is reassigned to the Honorable Barbara J. Rothstein because it is related to Case No. CV 21-1118BJR. All pleadings filed in the future shall bear case numbers CV 21-1460BJR. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (SR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-01118 2:21-cv-01119 2:21-cv-01130 2:21-cv-01137 2:21-cv-01138 2:21-cv-01139 2:21-cv-01148 2:21-cv-01148 2:21-cv-01130 2:21-cv-01153 2:21-cv-01157 2:21-cv-01161 2:21-cv-01169 2:21-cv-01179 2:21-cv-01181 2:21-cv-01183 2:21-cv-01189 2:21-cv-01190 2:21-cv-01208 2-21-cv-01321 2-21-cv-01324 2:21-cv-01415, by Plaintiffs Mario Gordon, Melani Gordon, Rachel Gurley, Andrew Luna, Linda Song. (Dennett, Jason) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2021)

1 #2

Summons

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-01460. (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MDL 3019 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1); in re T-Mobile Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; transferred to the Western District of Missouri; assigned to Judge Wimes. (Attachments: #1 CTO email) (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Proceedings pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorneys Kathleen M O'Sullivan, Lauren Jeffers Tsuji added for T-Mobile USA Inc, per #8 Notice of Appearance. (MW) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristine McAlister Brown for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Stay Proceedings pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristine McAlister Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7335363 (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steve Y Koh on behalf of Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on T-Mobile USA Inc on 11/3/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Mario Gordon, Melani Gordon, Rachel Gurley, Andrew Luna, Linda Song. (Stephens, Kim) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER: This action is reassigned to the Honorable Barbara J. Rothstein because it is related to Case No. CV 21-1118BJR. All pleadings filed in the future shall bear case numbers CV 21-1460BJR. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (SR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketJudge Richard A. Jones added. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-01118 2:21-cv-01119 2:21-cv-01130 2:21-cv-01137 2:21-cv-01138 2:21-cv-01139 2:21-cv-01148 2:21-cv-01148 2:21-cv-01130 2:21-cv-01153 2:21-cv-01157 2:21-cv-01161 2:21-cv-01169 2:21-cv-01179 2:21-cv-01181 2:21-cv-01183 2:21-cv-01189 2:21-cv-01190 2:21-cv-01208 2-21-cv-01321 2-21-cv-01324 2:21-cv-01415, by Plaintiffs Mario Gordon, Melani Gordon, Rachel Gurley, Andrew Luna, Linda Song. (Dennett, Jason) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) T-Mobile USA Inc with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7309749), filed by Linda Song, Andrew Luna, Mario Gordon, Melani Gordon, Rachel Gurley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dennett, Jason) Modified on 10/28/2021 to edit party name. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less