This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2022 at 08:42:57 (UTC).

Sompo Japan Insurance Inc. v. United States Seafoods, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 Sompo Japan Insurance Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against United States Seafoods, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Sedwick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00123

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Sedwick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sompo Japan Insurance Inc.

Defendant

United States Seafoods, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John C. Pharr

Attorney at Law Offices of John C. Pharr

733 W. 4Th Avenue, Suite 308

Anchorage, AK 99501

David Thomas Maloof

Attorney at Maloof & Browne LLC

411 Theodore Fremd Avenue, Ste 190

Rye, NY 10580

Kipp Charles Leland

Attorney at Maloof & Browne LLC

411 Theodore Fremd Avenue, Ste 190

Rye, NY 10580

Defendant Attorney

Donald K. McLean

Attorney at Bauer Moynihan & Johnson LLP

2101 Fourth Avenue, Suite 2400

Seattle, WA 98121

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United States Seafoods, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AAKDC-3254264.), filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc..(Pharr, John) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Pharr, John) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#3

(#3) Unissued summons re Defendant United States Seafoods, LLC, (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Donald K. McLean on behalf of United States Seafoods, LLC (McLean, Donald) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Kipp C. Leland. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3257223.) by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc..(Pharr, John) (Entered: 05/22/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney David T. Maloof. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3257224.) by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc..(Pharr, John) (Entered: 05/22/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 5/24/22. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney D. Maloof, K. Leland by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc..(Pharr, John) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on C T Corporation System (Registered Agent for Defendant United States Seafoods, LLC) on June 14, 2022, filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc.. (Leland, Kipp) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States Seafoods, LLC. (McLean, Donald) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#13

(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Leland, Kipp) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States Seafoods, LLC.(McLean, Donald) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact Discovery completed by 1/30/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 4/1/2023. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/11/22. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact Discovery completed by 1/30/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 4/1/2023. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/11/22. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States Seafoods, LLC.(McLean, Donald) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Leland, Kipp) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States Seafoods, LLC. (McLean, Donald) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on C T Corporation System (Registered Agent for Defendant United States Seafoods, LLC) on June 14, 2022, filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc.. (Leland, Kipp) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE re #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David T. Maloof, at docket #6 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE re #5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kipp C. Leland, at docket #5 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Annotation: Your recent electronic filing with the District of Alaska is in error: Wrong Event Selected re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ). Motion terminated. Docket entry will be linked to the filings at dockets #5 and #6 . No further action needed. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney D. Maloof, K. Leland by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc..(Pharr, John) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 5/24/22. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney David T. Maloof. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3257224.) by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc..(Pharr, John) (Entered: 05/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Kipp C. Leland. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3257223.) by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc..(Pharr, John) (Entered: 05/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Donald K. McLean on behalf of United States Seafoods, LLC (McLean, Donald) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to United States Seafoods, LLC. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unissued summons re Defendant United States Seafoods, LLC, (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Pharr, John) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United States Seafoods, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AAKDC-3254264.), filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc..(Pharr, John) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sompo America Insurance Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald K McLean