This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2022 at 07:34:29 (UTC).

Sompo Japan Insurance Inc. v. Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Sompo Japan Insurance Inc filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Mediterranean Shipping Company S A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory H. Woods and Sarah L Cave. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01672

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

Referral Judge

Sarah L Cave

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sompo Japan Insurance Inc.

Defendants

Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dennis A. Cammarano

Attorney at Law Offices of Dennis A. Cammarano

555 East Ocean Blvd., Suite 501

Long Beach, CA 90802

Defendant Attorney

Mark A. Beckman

Attorney at Gordon & Rees , LLP

1 Battery Plaza,28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25792739)Document filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc...(Cammarano, Dennis) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc...(Cammarano, Dennis) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cammarano, Dennis) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of and Certification of Interested Parties. Document filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc...(Cammarano, Dennis) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (vf) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such Motions. SO ORDERED. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/02/2022) (ama) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. served on 3/9/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. Service was accepted by J. CRUZ. Document filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc...(Cammarano, Dennis) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#8

(#8) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Mark A. Beckman dated March 30, 2022. Document filed by Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER: granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Mark A. Beckman dated March 30, 2022. Defendant's requested extension (ECF No. 8) is GRANTED. By May 2, 2022, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 8. SO ORDERED. Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. answer due 5/2/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 3/31/2022) (ama) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Mark A. Beckman dated March 30, 2022. Defendant's requested extension (ECF No. 8) is GRANTED. By May 2, 2022, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 8. SO ORDERED. Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. answer due 5/2/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 3/31/2022) (ama) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Mark A. Beckman dated March 30, 2022. Document filed by Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. served on 3/9/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. Service was accepted by J. CRUZ. Document filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc...(Cammarano, Dennis) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such Motions. SO ORDERED. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/02/2022) (ama) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (vf) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Dennis A. Cammarano. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Citizenship Plaintiff code 7 (NONE); Citizenship Defendant code 7 (NONE); Dollar Demand 107,271,000; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 4 (Diversity); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 3 (Citizen or Subject of a Foreign Country); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to 107,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S. (vf) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of and Certification of Interested Parties. Document filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc...(Cammarano, Dennis) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cammarano, Dennis) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc...(Cammarano, Dennis) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25792739)Document filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc...(Cammarano, Dennis) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sompo America Insurance Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark A. Beckman