This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/16/2022 at 09:21:45 (UTC).

Something Extra Publishing, Inc. v. Google, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 Something Extra Publishing, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Google, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. Kevin Castel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-09523

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. Kevin Castel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Something Extra Publishing, Inc.

Defendants

Google LLC

Facebook Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven A. Martino

Attorney at Taylor Martino, P.C.

P.O. Box 894

Mobile, AL 36601

Tiffany Ray

Attorney at Taylor Martino, P.C.

455 Saint Louis St.Suite 2100

Mobile, AL 36602

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Something Extra Publishing, Inc. (Ray, Tiffany) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc., Google, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#4

(#4) Service Order entered 10/27/2021. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 12/10/2021. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 10/27/21. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Something Extra Publishing, Inc.. (Ray, Tiffany) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Something Extra Publishing, Inc.. Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 10/30/2021, answer due 12/29/2021. (Ray, Tiffany) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Something Extra Publishing, Inc.. Google, LLC waiver sent on 11/1/2021, answer due 12/31/2021. (Ray, Tiffany) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#11

(#11) Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Southern District of New York requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District. Case Closed. (tgw) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

12 #12

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

12 #1

*Restricted*

#26

(#13) INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...Having considered Ms. Vash's letter of December 17 for certain plaintiffs and Ms. Sessions letter of December 21 for Google, it is hereby Ordered by the Court that, as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: (190 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference and Interim Protective Order addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Serina M. Vash dated December 17, 2021. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/21/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (vfr) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...Having considered Ms. Vash's letter of December 17 for certain plaintiffs and Ms. Sessions letter of December 21 for Google, it is hereby Ordered by the Court that, as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: (190 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference and Interim Protective Order addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Serina M. Vash dated December 17, 2021. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/21/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (vfr) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sjo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sjo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (sjo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (sjo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Alabama Southern; Case Number: 1:21-cv-00468. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Southern District of New York requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District. Case Closed. (tgw) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #6 Disclosure Statement filed by Something Extra Publishing, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/8/2021. (ctn) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by Something Extra Publishing, Inc. (Steele, William) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Something Extra Publishing, Inc.. Google, LLC waiver sent on 11/1/2021, answer due 12/31/2021. (Ray, Tiffany) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Something Extra Publishing, Inc.. Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 10/30/2021, answer due 12/29/2021. (Ray, Tiffany) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Something Extra Publishing, Inc.. (Ray, Tiffany) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Docket(#5) TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Something Extra Publishing, Inc. is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (required of "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (required of "nongovernmental corporate" parties) no later than Tues. 11/2/2021 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/27/2021. (ctn) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Service Order entered 10/27/2021. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 12/10/2021. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 10/27/21. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc., Google, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Something Extra Publishing, Inc. (Ray, Tiffany) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Something Extra Publishing, Inc. against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2896688, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Something Extra Publishing, Inc.. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 1/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ray, Tiffany) (cmj). [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant