This case was last updated from PACER on 11/21/2021 at 06:58:35 (UTC).

Something Extra Publishing, Inc. v. Google, LLC et al

Case Summary

On October 26, 2021, Something Extra Publishing, Inc. (hereinafter “Something Extra” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Tiffany Ray of Taylor Martino, P.C. filed an antitrust lawsuit against GOOGLE LLC (“Google”) and Facebook, Inc. (“Facebook”) (collectively “Defendants”) seeking declaratory and injunctive relief along with treble and punitive damages for alleged violations of Antitrust laws by Defendants. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Southern District of Alabama with Judges William H. Steele and Katherine P. Nelson presiding.

 

In its complaint, Plaintiff alleged that “Plaintiff and other newspapers across the country compete for revenue in the digital advertising market. Google monopolizes the market to such extent that it threatens the extinction of local newspapers across the country. There is no longer a competitive market in which newspapers can fairly compete for online advertising revenue. Google has vertically integrated itself, through hundreds of mergers and acquisitions, to enable dominion over all sellers, buyers, and middlemen in the marketplace. It has absorbed the market internally and consumed most of the revenue. Google’s unlawful anticompetitive conduct is directly stripping newspapers across the country, including Plaintiff, of their primary revenue source.”

 

Plaintiff further alleged that “Google and Facebook, archrivals in the digital advertising market, conspired to further their worldwide dominance of the digital advertising market in a secret agreement codenamed “Jedi Blue.” The two archrivals, who are sometimes referenced as operating a duopoly in the market, unlawfully conspired to manipulate online auctions which generate digital advertising revenue. Facebook and Google agreed to avoid competing with another in September 2018. The quid pro quo was as follows—Facebook would largely forego its foray into header bidding and would instead bid through Google’s ad server. In exchange, Google agreed to give Facebook preferential treatment in its auctions.”

 

Plaintiff also alleged that “There is a direct causal connection between these antitrust violations and the harm to Plaintiff. The harm was intentional and intended. The harm is of a type that Congress sought to redress in providing a private remedy for violations of the antitrust laws. The loss of revenue streams can be directly tied to the antitrust conduct of Defendants. Plaintiff is a direct victim of the alleged antitrust injury as a competitor in the digital advertising market. Damages can be quantified and apportioned among those directly and indirectly harmed.”

 

Plaintiff has laid down three claims for relief. The first claim is for Section 2 of the Sherman Act: 15 U.S.C. § 2 Google’s monopolization of the digital advertising market. The second claim is for Section 1 of the Sherman Act: 15 U.S.C. § 1 Google and Facebook conspired in restraint of trade. The last claim is that Google has been unjustly enriched. 

 

In its prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested the court to declare that the conduct of Defendants was in violation of Antitrust laws as alleged; award Plaintiff damages, treble damages, punitive damages, and/or restitution; permanently enjoin Defendants from continuing, maintaining, or renewing the conduct alleged herein together with pre- and post-judgment interest, and costs of litigation. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00468

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Steele

Referral Judge

Katherine P. Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Something Extra Publishing, Inc.

Defendants

Google, LLC

Facebook, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tiffany Ray

Attorney at Taylor Martino, P.C.

455 Saint Louis St., Suite 2100

Mobile, AL 36602

Steven A. Martino

Attorney at Taylor Martino, P.C.

Post Office Box 894

Mobile, AL 36601-0894

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Something Extra Publishing, Inc. (Ray, Tiffany) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc., Google, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#4

(#4) Service Order entered 10/27/2021. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 12/10/2021. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 10/27/21. (cmj) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Something Extra Publishing, Inc.. (Ray, Tiffany) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Something Extra Publishing, Inc.. Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 10/30/2021, answer due 12/29/2021. (Ray, Tiffany) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Something Extra Publishing, Inc.. Google, LLC waiver sent on 11/1/2021, answer due 12/31/2021. (Ray, Tiffany) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#11

(#11) Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Southern District of New York requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District. Case Closed. (tgw) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Southern District of New York requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District. Case Closed. (tgw) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #6 Disclosure Statement filed by Something Extra Publishing, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/8/2021. (ctn) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by Something Extra Publishing, Inc. (Steele, William) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Something Extra Publishing, Inc.. Google, LLC waiver sent on 11/1/2021, answer due 12/31/2021. (Ray, Tiffany) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Something Extra Publishing, Inc.. Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 10/30/2021, answer due 12/29/2021. (Ray, Tiffany) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Something Extra Publishing, Inc.. (Ray, Tiffany) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Docket(#5) TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Something Extra Publishing, Inc. is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (required of "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (required of "nongovernmental corporate" parties) no later than Tues. 11/2/2021 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/27/2021. (ctn) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Service Order entered 10/27/2021. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 12/10/2021. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 10/27/21. (cmj) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc., Google, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Something Extra Publishing, Inc. (Ray, Tiffany) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Something Extra Publishing, Inc. against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2896688, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Something Extra Publishing, Inc.. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 1/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ray, Tiffany) (cmj). (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven A. Martino