This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2021 at 08:16:34 (UTC).

Bridget Somerville et al v. Medtronic, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 Bridget Somerville filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Medtronic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Autumn D. Spaeth and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02177

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cooper Somerville

Bridget Somerville

Defendants

Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co

Medtronic Logistics, LLC

Medtronic USA, Inc.

Medtronic, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura J Baughman

Attorney at Martin Baughman, PLLC

3141 Hood Street, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Bridget Somerville, Cooper Somerville. upon Medtronic, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/22/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Lori Cohen. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Bridget Somerville, Cooper Somerville. upon Medtronic USA, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/22/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Lori Cohen. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Bridget Somerville, Cooper Somerville. upon Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/22/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Lori Cohen. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Bridget Somerville, Cooper Somerville. upon Medtronic Logistics, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/22/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Lori Cohen. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Ellen A. Presby on behalf of Plaintiffs Bridget Somerville, Cooper Somerville. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#9

(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ellen A. Presby. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendants Medtronic Logistics, LLC, Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co, Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

1 #14

Exhibit Exhibit 14

1 #12

Exhibit Exhibit 12

1 #11

Exhibit Exhibit 11

1 #10

Exhibit Exhibit 10

1 #9

Exhibit Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28983461 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Bridget Somerville, Cooper Somerville. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14a, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16) (Attorney Laura J Baughman added to party Bridget Somerville(pty:pla), Attorney Laura J Baughman added to party Cooper Somerville(pty:pla))(Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Bridget Somerville, Cooper Somerville. upon Medtronic, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/22/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Lori Cohen. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Bridget Somerville, Cooper Somerville. upon Medtronic USA, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/22/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Lori Cohen. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Bridget Somerville, Cooper Somerville. upon Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/22/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Lori Cohen. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Bridget Somerville, Cooper Somerville. upon Medtronic Logistics, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/22/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Lori Cohen. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Ellen A. Presby on behalf of Plaintiffs Bridget Somerville, Cooper Somerville. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ellen A. Presby. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendants Medtronic Logistics, LLC, Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co, Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Bridget Somerville, Cooper Somerville, identifying Bridget Somerville, Cooper Somerville, Ellen Presby/Van Wey Presby & Williams PLLC, Laura J. Baughman/Martin Baughman PLLC, Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Co., Medtronic Logistics, Inc.. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Bridget Somerville, Cooper Somerville. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Bridget Somerville, Cooper Somerville. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28983461 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Bridget Somerville, Cooper Somerville. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14a, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16) (Attorney Laura J Baughman added to party Bridget Somerville(pty:pla), Attorney Laura J Baughman added to party Cooper Somerville(pty:pla))(Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medtronic Logistics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura J Baughman