This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2023 at 10:04:32 (UTC).

Solvason v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 Solvason filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan van Keulen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-08990

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan van Keulen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hugh Solvason

Defendant

The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Corinne Chandler

Michelle Lee Roberts

Defendant Attorney

Jason A. James

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Roberts, Michelle) (Filed on 12/20/2022) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Hugh Solvason (Roberts, Michelle) (Filed on 12/20/2022) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hugh Solvason.. (Roberts, Michelle) (Filed on 12/20/2022) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2023 at 9:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2022) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2022) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hugh Solvason. Service waived by The Prudential Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 12/20/2022, answer due 2/21/2023. (Roberts, Michelle) (Filed on 1/3/2023) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Corinne Chandler (Chandler, Corinne) (Filed on 1/30/2023) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#11

(#11) ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (James, Jason) (Filed on 2/14/2023) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#12

(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Other Affiliate Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (James, Jason) (Filed on 2/14/2023) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/28/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2023) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Other Affiliate Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (James, Jason) (Filed on 2/14/2023) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (James, Jason) (Filed on 2/14/2023) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Corinne Chandler (Chandler, Corinne) (Filed on 1/30/2023) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING 3/21/23 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 3/14/23.Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2023 is advanced to 3/14/2023 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2023.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.can d.uscourts.gov/svk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2023) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hugh Solvason. Service waived by The Prudential Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 12/20/2022, answer due 2/21/2023. (Roberts, Michelle) (Filed on 1/3/2023) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2022) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2023 at 9:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2022) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hugh Solvason.. (Roberts, Michelle) (Filed on 12/20/2022) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2023. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2022) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Hugh Solvason (Roberts, Michelle) (Filed on 12/20/2022) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Roberts, Michelle) (Filed on 12/20/2022) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (ERISA) against The Prudential Insurance Company of America, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-17837738). Filed by Hugh Solvason. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roberts, Michelle) (Filed on 12/20/2022) Modified on 12/21/2022 (tn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less