This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/06/2020 at 09:29:03 (UTC).

SolutionInc Limited v. Nokia of America Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 SolutionInc Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Nokia of America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00187

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SolutionInc Limited

Defendant

Nokia of America Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Pazuniak

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SolutionInc Limited as to Sole Defendant (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number 7,526,538 (sam) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Nokia of America Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2846441.) - filed by SolutionInc Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED (ntl) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SolutionInc Limited as to Sole Defendant (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00185-LPS, 1:20-cv-00186-LPS, 1:20-cv-00187-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Nokia of America Corporation on 2/7/2020. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sam) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number 7,526,538 (sam) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Nokia of America Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2846441.) - filed by SolutionInc Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less