This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/02/2020 at 08:30:21 (UTC).

SolutionInc Limited v Netgear, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 SolutionInc Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Netgear, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02223

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SolutionInc Limited

Defendant

Netgear, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Pazuniak

Defendant Attorney

Richard L. Renck

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to February 28, 2020 - filed by Netgear, Inc.. (Renck, Richard) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Defendant to move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to January 31, 2020 - filed by Netgear, Inc.. (Renck, Richard) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Renck on behalf of Netgear, Inc. (Renck, Richard) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SolutionInc Limited. Netgear, Inc. served on 12/10/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,526,538. (amf) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Netgear, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2793495.) - filed by SolutionInc Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to February 28, 2020 filed by Netgear, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/27/20. (ntl) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to February 28, 2020 - filed by Netgear, Inc.. (Renck, Richard) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Defendant to move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to January 31, 2020 filed by Netgear, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/2/20. (ntl) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Defendant to move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to January 31, 2020 - filed by Netgear, Inc.. (Renck, Richard) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Renck on behalf of Netgear, Inc. (Renck, Richard) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SolutionInc Limited. Netgear, Inc. served on 12/10/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02223-LPS, 1:19-cv-02224-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Netgear, Inc. on 12/5/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (amf) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,526,538. (amf) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Netgear, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2793495.) - filed by SolutionInc Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less