This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/06/2020 at 09:28:52 (UTC).

SolutionInc Limited v. Avaya Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 SolutionInc Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Avaya Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00185

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SolutionInc Limited

Defendant

Avaya Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Pazuniak

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

1

1 #2

2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Respond to the Complaint to April 30, 2020 filed by SolutionInc Limited. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/31/20. (ntl) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Respond to the Complaint to April 30, 2020 - filed by SolutionInc Limited. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Respond to the Complaint to April 3, 2020 filed by SolutionInc Limited. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/5/20. (ntl) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Respond to the Complaint to April 3, 2020 - filed by SolutionInc Limited. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SolutionInc Limited. Avaya Inc. served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00185-LPS, 1:20-cv-00186-LPS, 1:20-cv-00187-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Avaya Inc. on 2/7/2020. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,526,538. (myr) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Avaya Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2846436.) - filed by SolutionInc Limited. (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less