This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:09:21 (UTC).

Soltis v. Hillsdale, County of et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 Soltis filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Hillsdale, County of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillip J. Green and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00209

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noah Soltis

Defendants

Jon Desjardin

Hillsdale, County of

Sheila Lonk

Thomas Dudley Gibbons, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher James Trainor

Attorney at Christopher Trainor & Associates

9750 Highland Rd.

White Lake, MI 48386

Michelle Marie Smigiel

Attorney at Christopher Trainor & Associates

9750 Highland Rd.

White Lake, MI 48386

Amy J. DeRouin

Attorney at Christopher Trainor & Associates

9750 Highland Rd.

White Lake, MI 48386

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew James Brege

Attorney at Rosati Schultz Joppich & Amtsbuechler, PC (Lansing)

822 Centennial Way, Ste. 270

Lansing, MI 48917

Thomas David Beindit

Attorney at Garan Lucow Miller PC (Detroit)

1000 Woodbridge St.

Detroit, MI 48207

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Jon Desjardin, Thomas Dudley Gibbons, III, Hillsdale, County of, Sheila Lonk for Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Beindit, Thomas) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#20

(#20) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of dismissal without prejudice as to count IV-gross negligence, only of plaintiff's complaint by plaintiff Noah Soltis (DeRouin, Amy) Modified text on 7/10/2019 (clw). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Noah Soltis for Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF NON-PARTY FAULT re Joseph Scott Ellsworth with Proof of Service by defendants Jon Desjardin, Thomas Dudley Gibbons, III, Hillsdale, County of, Sheila Lonk (Beindit, Thomas) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Noah Soltis for Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to All Defendants and Plaintiffs First Request for Production of Documents to All Defendants (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#16

(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 2/10/2020; dispositive motions due by 3/11/2020; early settlement conference set for 9/23/2019 at 09:00 AM at 740 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; settlement conference set for 9/23/2020 at 09:30 AM at 740 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; final pretrial conference set for 10/5/2020 at 09:30 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; jury trial set for 10/20/2020 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#15

(#15) MINUTES of scheduling conference held before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Court Reporter: Kathleen Thomas) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#14

(#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 6/10/2019 at 02:00 PM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 6/5/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#12

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

(#9) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to File Their Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint by defendants Jon Desjardin, Thomas Dudley Gibbons, III, Hillsdale, County of, Sheila Lonk [Attorney Andrew James Brege added to party Jon Desjardin(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew James Brege added to party Thomas Dudley Gibbons, III(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew James Brege added to party Hillsdale, County of(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew James Brege added to party Sheila Lonk(pty:dft)] (Brege, Andrew) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS returned executed; Thomas Dudley Gibbons, III served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Jon Desjardin served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS returned executed; Hillsdale, County of served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Jon Desjardin, Thomas Dudley Gibbons, III, Hillsdale, County of, Sheila Lonk (mg) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (mg) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#1

(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Trainor, Christopher) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Jon Desjardin, Thomas Dudley Gibbons, III, Hillsdale, County of, Sheila Lonk for Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Beindit, Thomas) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of dismissal without prejudice as to count IV-gross negligence, only of plaintiff's complaint by plaintiff Noah Soltis (DeRouin, Amy) Modified text on 7/10/2019 (clw). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Noah Soltis for Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE OF NON-PARTY FAULT re Joseph Scott Ellsworth with Proof of Service by defendants Jon Desjardin, Thomas Dudley Gibbons, III, Hillsdale, County of, Sheila Lonk (Beindit, Thomas) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Noah Soltis for Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to All Defendants and Plaintiffs First Request for Production of Documents to All Defendants (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 2/10/2020; dispositive motions due by 3/11/2020; early settlement conference set for 9/23/2019 at 09:00 AM at 740 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; settlement conference set for 9/23/2020 at 09:30 AM at 740 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; final pretrial conference set for 10/5/2020 at 09:30 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; jury trial set for 10/20/2020 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MINUTES of scheduling conference held before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Court Reporter: Kathleen Thomas) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michelle Marie Smigiel on behalf of plaintiff Noah Soltis (Smigiel, Michelle) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 6/10/2019 at 02:00 PM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 6/5/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to File Their Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint by defendants Jon Desjardin, Thomas Dudley Gibbons, III, Hillsdale, County of, Sheila Lonk [Attorney Andrew James Brege added to party Jon Desjardin(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew James Brege added to party Thomas Dudley Gibbons, III(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew James Brege added to party Hillsdale, County of(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew James Brege added to party Sheila Lonk(pty:dft)] (Brege, Andrew) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS returned executed; Thomas Dudley Gibbons, III served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS returned executed; Sheila Lonk served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Jon Desjardin served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS returned executed; Hillsdale, County of served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Jon Desjardin, Thomas Dudley Gibbons, III, Hillsdale, County of, Sheila Lonk (mg) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (mg) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Trainor, Christopher) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Noah Soltis in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4390319 (Trainor, Christopher) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against County of Hillsdale, Jon Desjardin, Thomas Dudley Gibbons, III, Sheila Lonk filed by Noah Soltis (Trainor, Christopher) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less